EP2085583 - Diagnosis device and method for a combustion engine particle filter and an associated pressure sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/32] | Diagnosis device and method for a combustion engine particle filter | ||
[2010/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2011/17] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Alfonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thouvenel, Nicolas 23 Avenue du General Leclerc 91610 Ballancourt sur Essonne / FR | 02 /
Pradeilles, Cyril 40 Avenue Gabriel Peri 94370 Sucy en Brie / FR | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/09] |
Former [2011/09] | Caillet, Isabelle, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/14] | Caillet, Isabelle, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09305067.2 | 26.01.2009 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | FR20080050516 | 28.01.2008 Original published format: FR 0850516 | [2009/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2085583 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2085583 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01N9/00, F01N11/00 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
F01N11/002 (EP);
F01N2550/04 (EP);
F01N2560/08 (EP);
F02B37/00 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | Diagnosevorrichtung und -verfahren eines Partikelfilters für einen Verbrennungsmotor and einen dazu gehörenden Drucksensor | [2010/35] | English: | Diagnosis device and method for a combustion engine particle filter and an associated pressure sensor | [2010/35] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de diagnostic d'un filtre à particules pour moteur à combustion et d'un capteur de pression associé | [2011/02] |
Former [2009/32] | Diagnosevorrichtung und -verfahren eines Partikelfilters für einen Verbrennungsmotor | ||
Former [2009/32] | Diagnosis device and method for a combustion engine particle filter | ||
Former [2009/32] | Dispositif et procédé de diagnostic d'un filtre a particules pour moteur à combustion | Examination procedure | 02.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.01.2009 | AT | 27.04.2011 | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | HR | 27.04.2011 | IE | 27.04.2011 | IT | 27.04.2011 | LT | 27.04.2011 | LV | 27.04.2011 | MK | 27.04.2011 | MT | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | PL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | NO | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | IS | 27.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | LU | 26.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MK | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
LU | 26.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MK | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MK | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MK | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MK | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
HR | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
NO | 27.07.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10184343 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [A] 1,7 * abstract *; | [X]FR2774421 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [X] 1,7 * page 4, line 25 - line 39 * * page 6, line 1 - line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR2829799 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,7 * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1582707 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7 * column 9, line 44 - column 10, line 45; figures 1,4 *; | [A]EP1849972 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8* figures 2-6; claims 8-11 * | by applicant | WO0127447 |