EP2213598 - Mail processing machine equipped with means for jogging mail articles against referencing walls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES 113, rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunnhuber, Werner Keltenstrasse 25 82054 Sauerlach / DE | 02 /
Lasinger, Martin Eichenhauserstrasse 42a 82054 Sauerlach / DE | 03 /
Stahl, Robert Pognerstrasse 19/3 81379 München / DE | [2011/28] |
Former [2010/31] | 01 /
Brunnhuber, Werner Keltenstrasse 25 82054 Sauerlach / DE | ||
02 /
Lasinger, Martin Eichenhauserstrasse 42a 82054 Sauerlach / DE | |||
03 /
Stahl, Robert Pognerstrasse 19/3 81379 Muchen / DE | Representative(s) | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | David, Alain, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09305094.6 | 30.01.2009 | [2010/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213598 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2213598 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/02, // B65H3/04 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
B65H3/042 (EP,US);
B65H5/026 (EP,US);
B65H2404/56 (EP,US);
B65H2404/561 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1916 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/31] | B65H3/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/31] |
Former [2010/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Postbearbeitungsmaschine, die mit Mitteln zum Fördern der Postartikel gegen eine Referenzwand ausgestattet ist | [2011/28] | English: | Mail processing machine equipped with means for jogging mail articles against referencing walls | [2010/31] | French: | Machine de traitement de courrier muni de moyens de taquage d'articles de courrier contre des parois de mise en référence | [2010/31] |
Former [2010/31] | Postbearbeitungsmaschine, die mit Mitteln zum fördern der Postartikel gegen eine Referenzwand ausgestattet ist | Examination procedure | 08.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 16.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0645327 (CGA HBS [FR]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9518054 (FALTEX AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 3, paragraph 8 - page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO03016187 (JAGENBERG QUERSCHNEIDER GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 33; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE29813546U (BIZERBA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * page 7, line 1 - line 22; figures 1-4 * |