EP2264602 - Memory device for managing the recovery of a non volatile memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daures, Daniel GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Dpt. 6 rue de la Verrerie 92197, MEUDON CEDEX / FR | [2010/51] | Application number, filing date | 09305555.6 | 17.06.2009 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2264602 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
G06F12/0246 (EP);
G06F2212/1032 (EP);
G06F2212/7207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Speichervorrichtung zur Verwaltung der Wiederherstellung eines nicht flüchtigen Speichers | [2010/51] | English: | Memory device for managing the recovery of a non volatile memory | [2010/51] | French: | Dispositif mémoire pour gérer la récupération d'une mémoire non volatile | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 05.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2011/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005251617 (SINCLAIR ALAN W [GB], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0011] , [0032] , [0036] , [0040]; figures 1,4 * * paragraphs [0047] , [0049] , [0061] , [0064] - [0075] - [0080] , [0084] , [0101] , [0103] *; | [A]US2006253645 (LASSER MENAHEM [IL]) [A] 1,11 * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0102]; figure 7 * * paragraphs [0109] , [ 111] *; | [A]WO2007066326 (MSYSTEMS LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1,8-11 * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 32; figure 2 * |