EP2208543 - process for the deposition of a material on the surface of an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benwadih, Mohamed 50D rue des Martyrs 38000 GRENOBLE / FR | 02 /
Heitzmann, Marie Lotissement La Blachette 38650 SINARD / FR | 03 /
Verilhac, Jean-Marie 32 Rue Jean Macé 38000 GRENOBLE / FR | [2010/29] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09306218.0 | 11.12.2009 | [2010/29] | Priority number, date | FR20090050301 | 19.01.2009 Original published format: FR 0950301 | [2010/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2208543 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B05D5/00, B05D7/00 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
B05D7/54 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02631 (KR);
B05D5/00 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y40/00 (KR);
H01L21/76825 (KR);
H01L21/76826 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abscheidung einem Werkstoff auf die Oberfläche eines Gegenstandes | [2010/29] | English: | process for the deposition of a material on the surface of an object | [2010/29] | French: | Procédé de dépôt d'un matériau à la surface d'un objet | [2010/29] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 01.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02307571 ; | [A]US4977242 (KUMAKI JIRO [JP]) [A] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US5102699 (BEESON CHARLES L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 9 *; | [XI]EP0728531 (CATALYSTS & CHEM IND CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7,10 * figure 1; example -; claim - * [I] 4,8,9,11; | [A]EP1101540 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 4 * example -; claim - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 06, Database accession no. 1991-040415, XP002583222 & JPH02307571 A 19901220 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |