EP2159123 - Mechanical installation for transporting a person on a bicycle or similar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pomagalski 109, rue Aristide Bergès 38340 Voreppe / FR | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mollet, Alain 15 Clos des Campanules 74940 Annecy le Vieux / FR | [2010/09] | Representative(s) | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10 rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2010/09] | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet HECKE 10 rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09354034.2 | 11.08.2009 | [2010/09] | Priority number, date | FR20080004695 | 26.08.2008 Original published format: FR 0804695 | [2010/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2159123 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2159123 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B61B11/00 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
B61B11/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | Mechanische Anlage zum Transport einer Person auf einem Fahrrad oder Ähnlichem | [2010/09] | English: | Mechanical installation for transporting a person on a bicycle or similar | [2010/09] | French: | Installation Mécanique pour le transport d'une personne sur une bicyclette ou analogue | [2010/09] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.08.2009 | CY | 27.06.2012 | CZ | 27.06.2012 | DK | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | FI | 27.06.2012 | HR | 27.06.2012 | LT | 27.06.2012 | LV | 27.06.2012 | MK | 27.06.2012 | MT | 27.06.2012 | NL | 27.06.2012 | PL | 27.06.2012 | RO | 27.06.2012 | SE | 27.06.2012 | SI | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | SM | 27.06.2012 | TR | 27.06.2012 | IE | 11.08.2012 | LU | 11.08.2012 | BE | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | NO | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | IS | 27.10.2012 | PT | 29.10.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 11.08.2009 | |
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
SM | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 11.08.2012 | ||
LU | 11.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
SM | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 11.08.2012 | ||
LU | 11.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 11.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 11.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 11.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 11.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/27] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | EE | 27.06.2012 | |
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
HR | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 27.06.2012 | |
NO | 27.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5566621 (WANVIK JARLE [NO], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CA775898 (GARBERS ERNST) [A] 1 * figures 1-8 * | by applicant | US5566621 |