EP2123917 - FRONT AND REAR GRILLES OF A FAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/48] | Front and rear grilles of a fan | ||
[2020/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. 112 Chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB 69130 Ecully / FR | [2016/41] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states SEB SA 4, chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veneziano, José Carlos Rua Jaguar, N° 167 -CEP 13280-000 Condominio Vista Alegre Vinhedo - SP / BR | 02 /
Merlo, Angelo Wagner Rua Gabrielle D'Annuzio, N° 125 Apto-71-CEP-04619-000 Bairro- Campo Belo -SP / BR | [2020/40] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
Veneziano, José Carlos Rua Jaguar, N° 167 -CEP 13280-000 Condominio Vista Alegre Vinhedo - SP / BR | ||
02 /
Merlo, Angelo Wagner Rua Gabrielle D'Annuzio, N° 125 Apto-71-CEP-04619-000 Bairro- Campo Belo -SP / BR | Representative(s) | SEB Développement Direction Propriété industrielle - Brevets 112, chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB - CS 90229 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/40] | SEB Developpement Brevets SEB Developpement Direction de la propriété industrielle - Brevets Campus SEB - CS 90229 112, chemin du Moulin Carron 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/48] | Kiehl, Hubert, et al SEB Développement Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09356036.5 | 15.05.2009 | [2009/48] | Priority number, date | BR2008PI01984 | 19.05.2008 Original published format: BR PI0801984 | [2009/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2123917 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2123917 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2123917 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/66, F04D29/68, F04D29/70 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
F04D29/663 (EP);
F04D29/681 (EP);
F04D29/703 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/40] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORDERES UND HINTERES GITTER EINES VENTILATORS | [2020/30] | English: | FRONT AND REAR GRILLES OF A FAN | [2020/30] | French: | GRILLES ANTERIEURE ET POSTERIEURE DE VENTILATEUR | [2020/30] |
Former [2009/48] | Vorderes und hinteres Gitter eines Ventilators | ||
Former [2009/48] | Front and rear grilles of a fan | ||
Former [2009/48] | Grilles anterieure et posterieure de ventilateur | Examination procedure | 27.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 12.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2009 | AT | 30.09.2020 | CY | 30.09.2020 | CZ | 30.09.2020 | DK | 30.09.2020 | EE | 30.09.2020 | ES | 30.09.2020 | FI | 30.09.2020 | GR | 30.09.2020 | HR | 30.09.2020 | IT | 30.09.2020 | LT | 30.09.2020 | LV | 30.09.2020 | MC | 30.09.2020 | MK | 30.09.2020 | MT | 30.09.2020 | NL | 30.09.2020 | PL | 30.09.2020 | RO | 30.09.2020 | SE | 30.09.2020 | SI | 30.09.2020 | SK | 30.09.2020 | BG | 30.12.2020 | NO | 30.12.2020 | IS | 30.01.2021 | PT | 01.02.2021 | GB | 15.05.2021 | IE | 15.05.2021 | LU | 15.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 15.05.2009 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
GR | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
MK | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
GB | 15.05.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HU | 15.05.2009 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
GR | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
GB | 15.05.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 15.05.2009 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
GB | 15.05.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
GB | 15.05.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
GB | 15.05.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
GB | 15.05.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
IE | 15.05.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
LU | 15.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
NO | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003049132 (PERELLA JAMES B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,12,13 * paragraph [0032]; figures 2,4 * [I] 3,4,7-11,14,15; | [A]US2653757 (BERNARD SEGALMAN) [A] 1 * figure 24; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19536928 (LOH KG RITTAL WERK [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | US2100994 | US2950859 | US6071079 | by applicant | EP0709576 | US3995970 |