EP2131119 - Tactile control unit for electrical heat emitters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBER EMEC, S.A. Edificio Ibermec Poligono Lanbarren 20180 Oyarzun Guipuzcoa / ES | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martinez Villar, Jose Luis Edificio Ibermec, Pol. Lanbarren 20180 Oyarzun (Guipuzcoa) / ES | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Manzano Cantos, Gregorio, et al Cabinet Manzano Avda. Pedro Diez, 21 Duplicado 1° Oficina 9 28019 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Manzano Cantos, Gregorio, et al Cabinet Manzano Embajadores, 55 28012 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 09380044.9 | 09.03.2009 | [2009/50] | Priority number, date | ES20080001220U | 08.06.2008 Original published format: ES 200801220 U | [2009/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2131119 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2131119 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F24H9/20 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
F24H9/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | Steuereinheit mit Berührungssteuerung für elektrische Wärmeemittenten | [2009/50] | English: | Tactile control unit for electrical heat emitters | [2009/50] | French: | Unité de commande de "contrôle tactile" pour émetteurs thermiques électriques | [2009/50] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 18.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 04.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4554437 (WAGNER DENNIS L [US], et al) [Y] 2,4 * column 4 - column 5; figures 1,5 *; | [Y]EP0443924 (SCHOLTES SOC [FR]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0029] *; | [A]US5321229 (HOLLING RONALD W [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 10; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19950985 (LOPIC MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [IY]DE102004025927 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [I] 1,3,5 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0051]; figure 3 * [Y] 2,4; | [A]US2006186214 (SIMON TIMOTHY M [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0125]; figure 5 *; | [A]EP1701236 (KERMI GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] *; | [Y]EP1811240 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0018] , [0 51] , [0 52] , [0 58]; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | ES200402323 |