EP2249327 - Identification device, container equipped with such a device and method for assembling the unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/45] | Identification device, container equipped with such a device and method for assembling the unit | ||
[2014/44] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For:ES
Athelia Solutions Iberica S.L. Rosa de Lima 1bis Edificio Alba 28290 Las Matas - Madrid / ES | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Athelia Solutions 6, rue Cognacq Jay 75007 Paris / FR | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia Contreras, Gonzalo c/ Miguel Antón, 1A 28491 Navacerrada Madrid / ES | 02 /
Soria Colmenero, Gloria c/ Miguel Antón, 1A 28491 Navacerrada Madrid / ES | [2014/44] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
Garcia Contreras, Gonzalo c/ Miguel Antón, 1A 28491 Navacerrada Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
Soria Colmenero, Gloria c/ Miguel Antón, 1A 28491 Navacerrada Madrid / ES | Representative(s) | Debecker, Isabelle Virginie, et al Air Liquide Direction de la Propriete Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide S.A. 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2010/45] | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide S.A. 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09380098.5 | 08.05.2009 | [2014/44] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2249327 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2249327 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/02, G09F3/20, G06K19/077 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
G09F3/0297 (EP);
G06K19/04 (EP);
G06K19/07758 (EP);
G09F3/205 (EP);
F17C2205/058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | Identifizierungsvorrichtung, mit einer solchen Vorrichtung ausgestatteter Behälter und Montageverfahren des Ganzen | [2014/44] | English: | Identification device, container equipped with such a device and method for assembling the unit | [2014/44] | French: | Dispositif d'identification, conteneur pourvu d'un tel dispositif et procédé de montage de l'ensemble | [2014/44] |
Former [2010/45] | Identifizierungsvorrichtung, mit einer solchen Vorrichtung ausgestatteter Behälter und Montageverfahren des Ganzen | ||
Former [2010/45] | Identification device, container equipped with such a device and method for assembling the unit | ||
Former [2010/45] | Dispositif d'identification, conteneur pourvu d'un tel dispositif et procédé de montage de l'ensemble | Examination procedure | 29.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 20.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13168031.6 / EP2631892 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.2015
29.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE IDtek Identifikationslösungen GmbH Lilienthalstrasse 1 82178 Puchheim / DE Opponent's representative Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al, et al Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [2015/36] | 03.09.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.03.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.05.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.07.2017 | 14.06.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 24.06.2017 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/44] | 05.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2009 | AT | 29.10.2014 | BG | 29.10.2014 | CY | 29.10.2014 | CZ | 29.10.2014 | EE | 29.10.2014 | FI | 29.10.2014 | HR | 29.10.2014 | IT | 29.10.2014 | LT | 29.10.2014 | LV | 29.10.2014 | MC | 29.10.2014 | MK | 29.10.2014 | MT | 29.10.2014 | PL | 29.10.2014 | RO | 29.10.2014 | SI | 29.10.2014 | SK | 29.10.2014 | TR | 29.10.2014 | NO | 29.01.2015 | GR | 30.01.2015 | IS | 28.02.2015 | GB | 08.05.2015 | IE | 08.05.2015 | LU | 08.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 08.05.2009 | |
AT | 29.10.2014 | ||
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
GB | 08.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.05.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
GB | 08.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.05.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
GB | 08.05.2015 | ||
IE | 08.05.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
IE | 08.05.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 29.10.2014 | |
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 29.10.2014 | |
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 29.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1011070 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,10-13 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 57; figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 8,9,14,15; | [XY]EP1011069 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,10-13 * column 4, line 15 - line 53; figures 1-3 * [Y] 8,9,14,15; | [XY]US5697173 (MCCARRICK HENRY JEMISON [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-13 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 30; figures 1-5 * [Y] 8,9,14,15; | [Y]US5555655 (YAGER JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,10-15 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 40; figures 3-8 *; | [Y]EP0586083 (HUGHES MICROELECTRONICS EUROPA [GB]) [Y] 1-7,10-15 * column 2, line 32 - column 5, line 20; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]FR2637021 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1011070 | EP1011069 | US5697173 | US5555655 | EP0586083 | FR2637021 |