EP2128025 - Anti-collision system between aircraft boarding bridges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Elevator Innovation Center S.A. Parque Científico y Tecnológico de Gijón Los Prados, 166 33203 Gijón Asturias / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Thyssenkrupp Elevator Innovation Center, S.A. Parque Científico y Tecnológico de Gijón Los Prados, 166 33203 Gijón Asturias / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fernandez Diaz, Julian c/José M Fernandez Buelta 6-6[deg]A 33012 Oviedo / ES | 02 /
Flores Castro, Alberto Castañera 66 33690 Lugo de Llanera / ES | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Goya 11 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 09380110.8 | 26.05.2009 | [2009/49] | Priority number, date | ES20080001597 | 28.05.2008 Original published format: ES 200801597 | [2009/49] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2128025 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2128025 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/305 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
B64F1/3055 (EP);
B64F1/305 (ES)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System gegen Zusammenstösse von Flugzeug-Zugangsbrücken | [2009/49] | English: | Anti-collision system between aircraft boarding bridges | [2009/49] | French: | Système anti-collision entre des ponts d'embarcation d'avion | [2009/49] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/11] | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01168599 (SHIN MEIWA IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH02182598 (OBE KOGYO KK); | [XY]JP2000355298 (SHIN MEIWA IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2004161195 (SHIN MEIWA IND CO LTD); | [A]US2006066470 (ANDERSON DAVID M [US], et al) |