EP2199490 - Removable surface covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sansano Marti, Vicente- Francisco Metge Joan Martí, n° 8-13 12200 Onda (Castellón) / ES | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Ungria Lopez, Javier, et al Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 09380190.0 | 17.12.2009 | [2010/25] | Priority number, date | ES20080003626 | 19.12.2008 Original published format: ES 200803626 | [2010/25] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2199490 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2199490 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
E04F15/02038 (EP);
E04C2/52 (ES);
E04F11/16 (ES);
E04F15/02183 (EP);
E04F15/02194 (EP);
E04F15/024 (ES);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Abnehmbare Oberflächenverkleidung | [2010/25] | English: | Removable surface covering | [2010/25] | French: | Revêtement de surface amovible | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003061772 (BERTOLINI GEOFFREY MICHAEL [AU]) | by applicant | JP2004002065 | WO2007000449 |