EP2248960 - A device for tensioning an element, for instance a plastic sheet or a textile material, a panel with such a device and an assembly method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IASO, S.A. Ctra. Nacional II, Km. 463,5 25194 Lleida / ES | [2013/04] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states IASO, S.A. Ctra. National II, Km. 463,5 25194 Lleida / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reitsma, Feike / Ctra. Nacional II, Km. 463,5 25194 Lleida / ES | [2013/04] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
Reitsma, Feike Ctra. Nacional II, Km. 463,5 25194 Lleida / ES | Representative(s) | Hernández Hernández, Carlos Olten Patentes y Marcas Entença, 332-334 3 -2 08029 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Hernández Hernández, Carlos Olten Patentes y Marcas Entença, 332-334 08029 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2011/37] | Hernández Hernández, Carlos Olten Patentes y Marcas C/ Rocafort 87, entlo. 4 08015 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2010/45] | Martin Santos, Victoria Sofia UDAPI & Asociados Patentes y Marcas Explanada, 8 28040 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 09382062.9 | 04.05.2009 | [2010/45] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2248960 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2248960 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/00, G09F15/00, F16B5/06 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
G09F15/0025 (EP);
E04F13/005 (EP);
F16B5/0692 (EP);
G09F15/0018 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/45] | E04F13/00, F16B5/06, E04B2/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Spannen eines Elements, insbesondere einer Kunststofffolie oder eines Textilmaterials, Paneel mit einer solchen Vorrichtung und Montageverfahren | [2010/45] | English: | A device for tensioning an element, for instance a plastic sheet or a textile material, a panel with such a device and an assembly method | [2010/45] | French: | Dispositif de mise en tension d'un élément, en particulier une feuille plastique ou un matériau textile, panneau avec un tel dispositif et procédé d'assemblage | [2010/45] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 16.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2009 | AT | 23.01.2013 | CY | 23.01.2013 | CZ | 23.01.2013 | DK | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | FI | 23.01.2013 | HR | 23.01.2013 | LT | 23.01.2013 | LV | 23.01.2013 | MC | 23.01.2013 | MK | 23.01.2013 | MT | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SE | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | NO | 23.04.2013 | IE | 04.05.2013 | IS | 23.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MK | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
MT | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IE | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
NO | 23.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0495688 (ROUSSEAU SOCIETE ANONYME ETS [FR]) [X] 1-10 * column 6, line 5 - column 8, line 21 * * figures 4a,4b *; | [X]DE3136897 (ALUMINIUM WALZWERKE SINGEN [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10 * page 12 - page 14 * * figures 4-6 *; | [X]DE29707701U (BUETHE REINHARD [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-10 * page 6 - page 7 * * figure - *; | [X]US5758922 (WHEATLEY DONALD G [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-10 * column 2, line 53 - column 5, line 38 * * figure - *; | [X]US3950869 (SAMARIN JOHN JACOB) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,10 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 51 * * figures 5,6 *; | [A]WO2006041722 (MORRIS MILTON A [US]) [A] 1,7,10 * figure - *; | [A]US2005139334 (BERNARDI ARRIGO [IT]) [A] 1,7,10 * figure - *; | [A]GB1393851 (ASSAEL MARCEL) [A] 1,7,10 * figure - *; | [DA]WO2006063991 (TENSOFORMA TRADING SRL [IT], et al) [DA] 1,7,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1825080 |