EP2113615 - Two-way barrier for preventing rats or other vermin from entering a sewage pipe system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordisk Innovation ApS Bredevej 32 8250 Egå / DK | [2009/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flemming Lykke Sorensen Bredevej 32 DK-8250 Ega / DK | 02 /
Michael Lykke Sorensen Kaldalvej 7 Skrodstrup DK-9550 Mariager / DK | [2009/45] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen / DK | Application number, filing date | 09389501.9 | 05.03.2009 | [2009/45] | Priority number, date | DK20080000327 | 05.03.2008 Original published format: DK 200800327 | [2009/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2113615 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2113615 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E03F7/06 | [2009/45] | CPC: |
E03F7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/45] | Title | German: | Zwei-Wege-Sperre gegen das Eindringen von Ratten oder anderem Ungeziefer in ein Abwasserrohrsystem | [2009/45] | English: | Two-way barrier for preventing rats or other vermin from entering a sewage pipe system | [2009/45] | French: | Barrière bidirectionelle pour empêcher les rats ou autres animaux indésirables d'entrer dans un système de tuyau pour eaux usées | [2009/45] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 10.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2009 | CY | 04.05.2011 | CZ | 04.05.2011 | EE | 04.05.2011 | FI | 04.05.2011 | HR | 04.05.2011 | IT | 04.05.2011 | LT | 04.05.2011 | LV | 04.05.2011 | MK | 04.05.2011 | MT | 04.05.2011 | PL | 04.05.2011 | RO | 04.05.2011 | SI | 04.05.2011 | SK | 04.05.2011 | TR | 04.05.2011 | BG | 04.08.2011 | NO | 04.08.2011 | GR | 05.08.2011 | ES | 15.08.2011 | IS | 04.09.2011 | PT | 05.09.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
HR | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
MK | 04.05.2011 | ||
MT | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
TR | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
HR | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
MK | 04.05.2011 | ||
MT | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
MK | 04.05.2011 | ||
MT | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
MK | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
MK | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/27] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
HR | 23.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
PL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
LV | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
IS | 04.09.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
LT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 04.05.2011 | |
NO | 04.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE699005 (HENRY NOWAK) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US4356087 (MILES ROBERT A) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE4322260 (RICHLING NORBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1826326 (NORDISK INNOVATION APS [DK]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE699005 | WO9221830 | WO03069082 | EP1826326 |