EP2210994 - Modular stairway [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pro-Cord S.p.A. Via del Battiferro, 4 40129 Bologna / IT | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piretti, Giancarlo c/o Pro-Cord S.p.A., Via del Battiferro, 4 40129 Bologna / IT | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 09425011.5 | 21.01.2009 | [2010/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2210994 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/035 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
E04F11/035 (EP);
E04F11/1041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/14] |
Former [2010/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Modulare Treppe | [2010/30] | English: | Modular stairway | [2010/30] | French: | Escalier modulaire | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4296577 (SCHUETTE HEINZ G) [X] 1 * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 14 * * figure - * [Y] 2-7; | [X]EP0380198 (YAMAZAKI KEIICHIRO) [X] 1 * column 14, line 44 - column 17, line 9 * * figures 39,48,49 *; | [Y]DE19853524 (GERHARD WOLF GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2-4 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 6 * * figure -; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE2516139 (FRANK GMBH WILH) [Y] 5-7 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 2 *; | [A]WO2004057130 (ABACUS S R L [SM], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 28 - page 10, line 8 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0866194 (ALBINI & FONTANOT SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 21 - column 5, line 20 * |