EP2284025 - Rear traction commercial vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iveco S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 10156 Torino / IT | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zanini, Emanuele Via Genova 165 10127 Torino / IT | 02 /
Casella, Giovanni Via Ugo Foscolo 29 25016 Ghiedi / IT | 03 /
Castellaneta, Matteo Via per Vimodrone 5 20093 Cologno Monzese / IT | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Borsano, Corrado, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Borsano, Corrado, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09425325.9 | 10.08.2009 | [2011/07] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2284025 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2284025 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60G9/00, B60G11/04, B60G11/38, B60K17/16 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
B60G11/04 (EP);
B60G11/38 (EP);
B60K17/16 (EP);
B60G2202/24 (EP);
B60G2204/19 (EP);
B60G2206/601 (EP);
B60Y2200/14 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | B60G9/00, B60G11/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | Nutzfahrzeug mit Hinterradantrieb | [2011/07] | English: | Rear traction commercial vehicle | [2011/07] | French: | Véhicule commercial à traction arrière | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 04.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2009 | AT | 20.06.2012 | BE | 20.06.2012 | CY | 20.06.2012 | CZ | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | HR | 20.06.2012 | LT | 20.06.2012 | LV | 20.06.2012 | MK | 20.06.2012 | MT | 20.06.2012 | PL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | SM | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | IE | 10.08.2012 | LU | 10.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | NO | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | IS | 20.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 10.08.2009 | |
AT | 20.06.2012 | ||
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
SM | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
LU | 10.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
SM | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
LU | 10.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
MT | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
PL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
IS | 20.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
HR | 20.06.2012 | ||
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
LV | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
LT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NO | 20.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 20.06.2012 | |
NO | 20.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2005012010 (MAGNA INT INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,13-15 * abstract * [Y] 10-12; | [XY]US2369501 (MAX WAGNER, et al) [X] 1-4,7-8,13 * page 2, line 64 - page 3, line 2; figures 1-7 * [Y] 10; | [X]DE763050 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1-4,7-8,13 * page 2, line 105 - page 3, line 8; figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]EP1872982 (DANA CORP [US]) [Y] 11-12 * abstract *; | [A]DE19623936 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 10 * abstract *; | [A]GB2061453 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 11-12 * figure 8 *; | [A]WO03106247 (ARBOC LTD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]GB2347398 (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JPH07228163 (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |