EP2327841 - Assembly kit for a mixer tap, mixer tap and assembly method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRS S.p.A. Via Principe Amedeo, 3 20121 Milano / IT | [2011/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luglio, Salvatore c/ CRS S.p.A. Via Principe Amedeo, 3 20121 Milano / IT | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/22] | 01 /
Luglio, Salvatore c/ CRS S.p.A. Via Principe Amedeo, 3 20121 Milano / IT | Representative(s) | Chimini, Francesco, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza Mario Saggin, 2 35131 Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Chimini, Francesco, et al c/o Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Berchet, 9 35131 Padova / IT | ||
Former [2011/22] | Chimini, Francesco, et al c/o Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Berchet, 9 35131 Padova / IT | Application number, filing date | 09425482.8 | 25.11.2009 | [2011/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2327841 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2327841 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/042, F16L25/14, F16L27/08 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
E03C1/042 (EP);
F16L25/14 (EP);
F16L27/0804 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/22] | E03C1/042, F16L25/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2011/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Bausatz für eine Mischbatterie, Mischbatterie und Montageverfahren einer Mischbatterie | [2011/22] | English: | Assembly kit for a mixer tap, mixer tap and assembly method thereof | [2011/22] | French: | Kit d'assemblage pour mitigeur, mitigeur et procédé d'assemblage d'un mitigeur | [2011/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 19.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2009 | BE | 27.05.2015 | CY | 27.05.2015 | CZ | 27.05.2015 | DK | 27.05.2015 | EE | 27.05.2015 | ES | 27.05.2015 | FI | 27.05.2015 | HR | 27.05.2015 | LT | 27.05.2015 | LV | 27.05.2015 | MC | 27.05.2015 | MK | 27.05.2015 | MT | 27.05.2015 | NL | 27.05.2015 | PL | 27.05.2015 | RO | 27.05.2015 | SE | 27.05.2015 | SI | 27.05.2015 | SK | 27.05.2015 | SM | 27.05.2015 | TR | 27.05.2015 | BG | 27.08.2015 | NO | 27.08.2015 | GR | 28.08.2015 | IS | 27.09.2015 | PT | 28.09.2015 | GB | 25.11.2015 | IE | 25.11.2015 | LU | 25.11.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 25.11.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2015 | ||
CY | 27.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
NL | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SE | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
TR | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
GB | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 25.11.2015 | ||
LU | 25.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/47] | BE | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
GB | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 25.11.2015 | ||
LU | 25.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | BE | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.11.2015 | ||
LU | 25.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 27.05.2015 | |
CZ | 27.05.2015 | ||
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
LU | 25.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 27.05.2015 | |
DK | 27.05.2015 | ||
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
PL | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 27.05.2015 | |
ES | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2053945 (HANSA METALLWERKE) [X] 1,2,5,13,15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2346362 (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH) [X] 1,2,4,11,13-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0757134 (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,11,13-15 * the whole document *; | [X]GB460604 (ALEXANDER HUTCHISON, et al) [X] 1,2,5,12-14 * the whole document * |