EP2196443 - Incinerated husk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lustri, Marcello Via Pagnano, snc 04023 Formia (LT) / IT | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Cioncoloni, Giuliana Studio Consulenza Brevetti Cioncoloni S.r.l. Via Pietro Ferrigni, 28 00159 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Cioncoloni, Giuliana Studio Consulenza Brevetti Cioncoloni S.r.l. Via Filippo Turati, 76 00185 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2010/24] | Cioncoloni, Giuliana Studio Consulenza Brevetti Via Filippo Turati 76 00185 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 09425496.8 | 02.12.2009 | [2010/24] | Priority number, date | IT2008RM00645 | 03.12.2008 Original published format: IT RM20080645 | [2010/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2196443 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C05F5/00, C05F11/02, C05G1/00 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
C05F5/002 (EP,US);
A01G24/28 (EP,US);
C05F11/00 (EP);
Y02A40/20 (EP);
Y02P20/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Veraschte Spelze | [2010/24] | English: | Incinerated husk | [2010/24] | French: | Téguments incinérés | [2010/24] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 20.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/45] | 22.06.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2006111480 ; | [X]JPS5185915 ; | [X]EP0308555 (AGRITEC [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 20; example -; claim -; table 1 *; | [X]JPH0971491 (HORII MASAMI, et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract *; | [X]CN1699305 (JIANG WENLAN [CN]) [X] 1-5* abstract *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 42, Database accession no. 2006-406373, XP002549053 & JP2006111480 A 20060427 (DOKURITSU GYOSEI HOJIN NOGYO SEIBUTSU SH) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1976, no. 37, Database accession no. 1976-69343X, XP002549054 & JPS5185915 A 19760728 (SUMITOMO CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | Examination | JP2000191388 | JP2001089273 |