EP2123836 - Method for manufacturing a shell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Wien Karlsplatz 13 1040 Wien / AT | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kollegger, Johann Muehlengasse 23 3400 Klosterneuburg / AT | 02 /
Dallinger, Sonja Knoellgasse 33/43 1100 Wien / AT | 03 /
Pardatscher, Herbert Rieglgasse 8 1210 Wien / AT | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 09450102.0 | 19.05.2009 | [2009/48] | Priority number, date | AT20080000805 | 19.05.2008 Original published format: AT 8052008 | [2009/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123836 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/32 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
E04B1/3211 (EP);
E04B7/102 (EP);
E04G11/04 (EP);
E04G11/045 (EP);
E04B2001/3276 (EP);
E04B2001/3594 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Schale | [2009/48] | English: | Method for manufacturing a shell | [2009/48] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une coque | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 01.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2826157 (VARTIA KARL O) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 15 - column 4, line 8; figures 1-10 *; | [A]WO2007019593 (KOLLEGGER JOHANN [AT]) [A] 1,4,9,10 * page 4, line 9 - line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2005068740 (KOLLEGER JOHANN [AT], et al) | by applicant | AT410342B | DE3500153 | EP1706553 | - HERMANN RüHLE, Räumliche Dachtragwerke - Konstruktion und Ausführung, VEB VERLAG FüR BAUWESEN, (1969), vol. 1, page 177 | - Heinz Isler - Schalen, KARL KRäMER VERLAG, (1986), page 51 | - FRANZ DERFLINGER, "Kuppelbau mit pneumatischer Schalung", BETON- UND STAHLBETONBAU, (1983), pages 299 - 302 |