blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2165816

EP2165816 - Device for granulating plastic [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.11.2014
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.12.2014  [2014/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Econ GmbH
Biergasse 9
4616 Weißkirchen/Traun / AT
[2010/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Pirker, Dr. Stefan
Lehnergutstrasse 16
4060 Leonding / AT
02 / Gittler, Dr. Philipp
Jodlgasse 7
1130 Wien / AT
 [2010/12]
Representative(s)Hübscher & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH
Spittelwiese 4
4020 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Patentanwaltzkanzlei Hübscher
Spittelwiese 4
4020 Linz / AT
Former [2010/12]Hübscher, Helmut, et al
Spittelwiese 7
4020 Linz / AT
Application number, filing date09450170.711.09.2009
[2010/12]
Priority number, dateAT2008000145018.09.2008         Original published format: AT 14502008
[2010/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2165816
Date:24.03.2010
Language:DE
[2010/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2165816
Date:11.12.2013
Language:DE
[2013/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.2013
ClassificationIPC:B29B9/06
[2010/12]
CPC:
B29B9/065 (EP); B29B9/06 (US); B29C48/0022 (EP);
B29C48/05 (EP); B29C48/345 (EP); B29C48/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/12]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Granulieren von Kunststoff[2010/12]
English:Device for granulating plastic[2010/12]
French:Dispositif destiné à granuler du plastique[2010/12]
Examination procedure12.06.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/50]
18.07.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
06.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201406   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1454863  (REIFENHAEUSER KG) [X] 1 * page 6 - page 8 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE2813332  (PLAST ELASTVERARBEITUNGSMASCH) [X] 1-4 * page 7 - page 9 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US4300877  (ANDERSEN HOWARD W) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 27 * * figures 2,3a *;
 [X]EP0432427  (WERNER & PFLEIDERER [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 9 - line 46 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [AD]DE19720722  (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-4 * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 59 ** figure 1 *
by applicantDE19720722
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.