blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2332463

EP2332463 - Device and method magnetic induction tomography [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.05.2012
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.06.2012  [2012/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technische Universität Graz
Rechbauerstrasse 12
8010 Graz / AT
For all designated states
Forschungsholding TU Graz GmbH
Rechbauerstrasse 12
8010 Graz / AT
[2011/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Scharfetter, Hermann
Luigi-Kasimir-Gasse 49
8045 Graz / AT
02 / Gürsoy, Doga
Arndtgasse 4 - 76
8010 Graz / AT
 [2011/24]
Representative(s)Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG
Biberstrasse 22
Postfach 36
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2011/24]Patentanwaltskanzlei Matschnig & Forsthuber OG
Siebensterngasse 54
1071 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date09450236.614.12.2009
[2011/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2332463
Date:15.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2010
ClassificationIPC:A61B5/053, A61B5/11, A61B19/00
[2011/24]
CPC:
A61B5/0536 (EP); A61B5/0522 (EP); A61B5/1127 (EP);
A61B5/7207 (EP); A61B2090/3954 (EP); A61B2090/3975 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur magnetischen Induktionstomographie[2011/24]
English:Device and method magnetic induction tomography[2011/24]
French:Appareil et méthode de tomographie à induction magnétique[2011/24]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/23]
23.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2012/23]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2008194982  (LANFERMANN GERD [DE], et al) [I] 1,3,4,7-10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0008] , [0013] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0043]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0047]; figures 5,6 * [Y] 2,5,6;
 [YD]WO2008011649  (UNIV GRAZ TECH [AT], et al) [YD] 5,6 * page 3, paragraphs 4-5 *;
 [A]WO2009144461  (UGCS UNIVERSITY OF GLAMORGAN C [GB], et al) [A] 1,7 * page 7, line 7 - page 9, line 22 * * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 18; figure 5 * * page 17, lines 6-17 * * page 18, line 26 - page 19, line 8 *;
 [A]WO2009149409  (CALYPSO MED TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 3 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0011] , [0019] - [0021] *
 [I]  - GÜRSOY D, SCHARFETTER H, "Reconstruction artefacts in magnetic induction tomography due to patient's movement during data acquisition", PHYSIOLOGICAL MEASUREMENT, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20090601), vol. 30, no. 6, ISSN 0967-3334, pages S165 - S174, XP020161081 [I] 1,7 * abstract * * Section 2.7 * * Section 4 *
 [YD]  - CASANAS R ET AL, "Biological tissue characterization by magnetic induction spectroscopy (MIS): requirements and limitations", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/TBME.2003.813533, (20030701), vol. 50, no. 7, ISSN 0018-9294, pages 870 - 880, XP011097445 [YD] 2 * Section B.1); page 876 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2003.813533
by applicantWO2008011649
    - GRIFFITHS H., "Magnetic induction tomography", MEAS. SCI. TECHNOL., vol. 26, pages 1126 - 1131
    - KORZHENEVSKII A. V.; V. A. CHEREPENIN, "Magnetic induction tomography", J. COM- MUN. TECH. ELECTRON., (1997), vol. 42, pages 469 - 474
    - HERMANN SCHARFETTER; ROBERTO CASANAS; JAVIER ROSELL, "Biological Tissue Characterization by Magnetic Induction Spectroscopy (MIS): Requirements and Limitations", IEEE TRANS. BIOMED. ENG., (2003), vol. 50, pages 870 - 880
    - MORTARELLI J. R. A., "Generalization of the Geselowitz Relationship Useful in Impedance Plethysmographic Field Calculations", IEEE TRANS. BIOMED. ENG., (1980), vol. 27, pages 665 - 667
    - GENCER NG; TEK MN, "Electrical conductivity imaging via contactless measurements", IEEE TRANS MED IMAG., (1999), vol. 18, pages 617 - 27
    - IEEE TRANS BIOMED ENG., (2003), vol. 50, pages 870 - 80
    - SCHARFETTER H; LACKNER HK; ROSELL J., "Magnetic induction tomography: Hardware for multi-frequency measurements in biological tissues", PHYSIOL. MEAS., (2001), vol. 22, pages 131 - 146
    - SCHARFETTER H.; KOST- INGER A.; ISSA S., "Hardware for quasi-single-shot multifrequency magnetic induction tomography", GRAZ MK2 SYSTEM. PHYSIOL. MEAS., (2008), vol. 29, pages S 431 - S 443
    - H. SCHARFETTER; S. ISSA, "Reduction of low-frequency noise in magnetic induction tomography systems", PROC. 8TH EMBEC, ANT- WERP, (2008), pages 752 - 55
    - SOLEIMANI M., "Computational aspects of low frequency electrical and electromagnetic tomography: A review study", INTERNATIONAL J NUM ANAL MOD., (2008), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 407 - 440
    - MORRIS A.; GRIFFITHS H.; GOUGH W., "A numerical model for magnetic induction tomographic measurements in biological tissues", PHYSIOL MEAS., (2001), vol. 22, pages 113 - 119
    - HOLLAUS K.; MAGELE C.; MERWA R.; SCHARFETTER H., "Fast calculation of the sensitivity matrix in magnetic induction tomography by tetrahedral edge finite elements and the reciprocity theorem", PHYSIOL MEAS., (2004), vol. 25, pages 159 - 68
    - TAPP HS; GOSS D ET AL., "A combined digital camera - EMT system to measure human body composition", PROC 3RD WORLD CONGRESS ON INDUSTRIAL PROCESS TOMOGRAPHY, (2003), pages 384 - 9
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.