EP2101390 - Method and device for the self service charging of batteries and portable electronic devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chargee Sp. z o.o. ul. Ksiazkowa 50/ 3 03-134 Warszawa / PL | [2009/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giza, Leszek ul. Grzymalitów 9 03-141 Warszawa / PL | 02 /
Padzinski, Andrzej ul. Ksiazkowa 50/3 03-134 Warszawa / PL | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Rzazewska, Dorota, et al JWP Rzecznicy Patentowi Dorota Rzazewska sp.k. Sienna Center ul. Zelazna 28/30 00-833 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Rzazewska, Dorota, et al JWP Rzecznicy Patentowi Dorota Rzazewska sp.j. Sienna Center Ul. Zelazna 28/30 00-833 Warszawa / PL | ||
Former [2009/38] | Twardowska, Aleksandra Jan Wierzchon & Partners Patent and Trademark Attorneys Ul. Zurawia 47/49 00-680 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 09460011.1 | 13.03.2009 | [2009/38] | Priority number, date | PL20080384704 | 14.03.2008 Original published format: PL 38470408 | [2009/38] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2101390 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
H02J7/0013 (EP,US);
H02J7/0044 (EP,US);
H02J2310/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Selbstbedienungs-Laden von Batterien und tragbaren elektronischen Geräten | [2009/38] | English: | Method and device for the self service charging of batteries and portable electronic devices | [2009/38] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour charger des batteries et de dispositifs électroniques portable en libre-service | [2009/38] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | EP0773519 | KR20030042401 | GB2433355 |