EP2242769 - ANTI-CADHERIN-11 EC1 DOMAIN ANTIBODIES FOR TREATING INFLAMMATORY JOINT DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/43] | CADHERIN-11 EC1 DOMAIN ANTAGONISTS FOR TREATING INFLAMMATORY JOINT DISORDERS | ||
[2015/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adheron Therapeutics, Inc. 200 Boston Avenue, Suite 1100 Medford, MA 02155 / US | [2014/08] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Synovex Corporation 200 Boston Avenue Suite 1100 Medford, MA 02155 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCARTHUR, James, G. 94 Upland Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2010/43] | Simpson, Mark Geoffrey Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09700394.1 | 09.01.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009US00162 | Priority number, date | US20080010734P | 11.01.2008 Original published format: US 10734 P | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009089062 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2242769 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2242769 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K38/17, A61K38/00, A61K39/395, A61K31/519, A61K45/06, C07K16/18 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/515 (EP,US);
C07K2317/74 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/43] | C07K16/28, A61K38/17 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2010/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CADERHIN-11 EC1 DOMÄNE ANTIKÖRPER ZUR BEHANDLUNG ENTZÜNDLICHER GELENKSERKRANKUNGEN | [2015/51] | English: | ANTI-CADHERIN-11 EC1 DOMAIN ANTIBODIES FOR TREATING INFLAMMATORY JOINT DISORDERS | [2015/51] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-CADHÉRINE-11 EC1 ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES INFLAMMATOIRES DES ARTICULATIONS | [2015/51] |
Former [2010/43] | CADHERIN-11-EC1-DOMÄNE-ANTAGONISTEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ENTZÜNDLICHER GELENKSERKRANKUNGEN | ||
Former [2010/43] | CADHERIN-11 EC1 DOMAIN ANTAGONISTS FOR TREATING INFLAMMATORY JOINT DISORDERS | ||
Former [2010/43] | ANTAGONISTES DE CADHÉRINE-11 ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES INFLAMMATOIRES DES ARTICULATIONS | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 24.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2015 | 10.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16194905.2 / EP3181588 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | LU | 09.01.2017 | MT | 09.01.2017 | BG | 02.02.2017 | NO | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/46] | CY | 02.11.2016 | |
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
LU | 09.01.2017 | ||
MT | 09.01.2017 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 02.11.2016 | |
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
LU | 09.01.2017 | ||
MT | 09.01.2017 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | EE | 02.11.2016 | |
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
LU | 09.01.2017 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | EE | 02.11.2016 | |
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | EE | 02.11.2016 | |
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | EE | 02.11.2016 | |
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 02.11.2016 | |
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9957149 (ADHEREX TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-9,19-23,25-27,29-32,34-39,41,43-46,49-55,60,61 * abstract * * page 130, paragraph 2 * * page 131, paragraph 2 * * page 138, line 15 * * page 142, line 9 *; | [A]WO0117557 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US]) [A] 1-9,19-23,25-39,41-61 * abstract * * figure 3; claims 1-49 *; | [X]WO2004048411 (ADHEREX TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-9,19-23,25-32,34-39,41,43-46,50,52-55,60,61 * claims 45,51,52,66 * * abstract * * page 112, paragraph 2 * * page 121, paragraph LAST * * page 133, line 8 *; | [A] - KIENER HANS P ET AL, "Building the synovium: cadherin-11 mediates fibroblast-like synoviocyte cell-to-cell adhesion.", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH & THERAPY 2005, (2005), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 1478-6362, pages 49 - 54, XP002528083 [A] 1-9,19-23,25-39,41-61 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/AR1495 | [A] - KIENER HANS P ET AL, "Cadherin-11 induces rheumatoid arthritis fibroblast-like synoviocytes to form lining layers in vitro.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY MAY 2006, (200605), vol. 168, no. 5, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 1486 - 1499, XP002528084 [A] 1-9,19-23,25-39,41-61 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2353/AJPATH.2006.050999 | [A] - VALENCIA XAVIER ET AL, "Cadherin-11 provides specific cellular adhesion between fibroblast-like synoviocytes.", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE 20 DEC 2004, (20041220), vol. 200, no. 12, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 1673 - 1679, XP002528085 [A] 1-9,19-23,25-39,41-61 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/JEM.20041545 | [A] - LEE DAVID M ET AL, "Cadherin-11 in synovial lining formation and pathology in arthritis.", SCIENCE (NEW YORK, N.Y.) 16 FEB 2007, (20070216), vol. 315, no. 5814, ISSN 1095-9203, pages 1006 - 1010, XP002528086 [A] 1-9,19-23,25-39,41-61 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/SCIENCE.1137306 | Examination | - Saurabh D. Patel ET AL, "Type II Cadherin Ectodomain Structures: Implications for Classical Cadherin Specificity", Cell, (20060301), vol. 124, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2005.12.046, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 1255 - 1268, XP055045706 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2005.12.046 | by applicant | US5545806 | US5545807 | WO9713852 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 2551 - 2555 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 |