EP2248038 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING DATA IN A COMPUTER NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peerapp, Ltd. Echo Bridge Office Park 375 Elliot Street Suite 150k Newton Upper Falls, MA 02464 / US | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AROLOVITCH, Alan 1530 Beacon St, Apt 301 Brookline MA 02446-2636 / US | [2010/45] | Representative(s) | Richardson, Julie Kate, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Richardson, Julie Kate, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2010/45] | Bradford, Victoria Sophie Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09700662.1 | 07.01.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009US30346 | Priority number, date | US20080019576 | 07.01.2008 Original published format: US 19576 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009089291 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2248038 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L67/1004 (US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L67/104 (EP,US);
H04L67/1072 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/45] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON DATEN IN EINEM COMPUTERNETZWERK | [2010/45] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING DATA IN A COMPUTER NETWORK | [2010/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR TRANSMETTRE DES DONNÉES DANS UN RÉSEAU D'ORDINATEUR | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 11.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 16.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005177624 (OSWALD JACK [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0159]; figures 3A-7,10-12; claims 1-9,54-56 * [I] 2,3,5-16; | [YA]US2007198726 (MARCO TALMON [IL], et al) [Y] 1-3,9-12,14-16 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0056]; figure 1 * [A] 4,13; | [Y] - Xie, H., "P4P: Proactive Provider Assistance for P2P", (20070525), URL: codex.cs.yale.edu/avi/home-page/p4p-dir/.../P4P_NYP2PMeetup.ppt, (20130905), XP002712353 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * | [YA] - OVERSI, "P2P Content Delivery Solutions", INTERNET CITATION, (20070701), URL: http://www.oversi.com/images/stories/white_paper_july.pdf, XP008139416 [Y] 5-8 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,9-16 | [YA] - NORTEL, "Delivering Application Availability, Performance and Security", INTERNET CITATION, (20071231), URL: http://www.peerapp.com/docs/Nortel_ Application_Switch.pdf, (20110711), XP008139420 [Y] 4,13 * the whole document * [A] 1-3 | International search | [A]US2003005040 (KUKKAL PUNEET [US]); | [A]US2003140159 (CAMPBELL ROY H [US], et al); | [Y]US2007198726 (MARCO TALMON [IL], et al); | [A]US2008005349 (LI QIANG [US], et al); | [X] - OVERSI, "P2P Content Delivery Solutions", WHITE PAPER, (200707), URL: http://www.oversi.com/images/stories/white_paper_july.pdf, (20090202), XP008139416 | [Y] - NORTEL, "Delivering Application Availability, Performance and Security", PRODUCT BRIEF, COPYRIGHT 2007 NORTEL NETWORKS, URL: http://www.peerapp.com/docs/Nortel_ Application_Switch.pdf, (20090202), XP008139420 | by applicant | US2005177624 | US2007198726 |