EP2233510 - NORMAL PRESSURE CATION DYEABLE POLYESTER AND FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Limited 6-7 Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Teijin Fibers Limited 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIKATSUNE, Tetsuya c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory 77 Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime 791-8041 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Kenji c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory 77 Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime 791-8041 / JP | 03 /
TACHIBANA, Kei c/o Teijin Limited Matsuyama Factory 77 Kitayoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime 791-8041 / JP | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09701180.3 | 07.01.2009 | [2010/39] | WO2009JP50067 | Priority number, date | JP20080001387 | 08.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008001387 | JP20080218081 | 27.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008218081 | [2010/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009088008 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2233510 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/688, D01F6/84 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
D01F6/84 (EP,US);
C08G63/6886 (EP,US);
C08G63/6926 (EP,US);
D01D5/24 (EP,US);
D01D5/253 (EP,US);
D02G3/28 (EP,US);
D02G3/32 (EP,US);
D06P3/522 (EP,US);
D10B2331/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | KATIONISCH FÄRBBARES NORMALDRUCK-POLYESTER UND FASER | [2010/39] | English: | NORMAL PRESSURE CATION DYEABLE POLYESTER AND FIBER | [2010/39] | French: | POLYESTER ET FIBRE POUVANT ÊTRE TEINTS PAR UN COLORANT CATIONIQUE À PRESSION NORMALE | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2010 | Translation filed | 23.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 19.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/38] | 30.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02074834 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-17* examples 4, 5 * | International search | [A]JPS6289725 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JPH0525708 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [A]JP2002030137 (NIPPON ESTER CO LTD); | [A]JP2005336385 (NIPPON ESTER CO LTD); | [A]JP2006176628 (TEIJIN FIBERS LTD); | [A]WO2006095627 (KB SEIREN LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPS3410497B | JPS6289725 | JPH01162822 | JPH01172425 | JPH07126920 | JP2002284863 | JP2006176628 | JP2006200064 |