EP2229657 - ZOOMABLE ADVERTISEMENTS WITH TARGETED CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREWER, Brett c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
KARIDI, Ron c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2010/38] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09701303.1 | 05.01.2009 | [2010/38] | WO2009US30128 | Priority number, date | US20080970530 | 08.01.2008 Original published format: US 970530 | [2010/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009089166 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2229657 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G06F17/00 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0256 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/38] | Title | German: | ZOOMBARE WERBEANZEIGEN MIT GEZIELTEM INHALT | [2010/38] | English: | ZOOMABLE ADVERTISEMENTS WITH TARGETED CONTENT | [2010/38] | French: | PUBLICITÉS À EFFET DE ZOOM ET À CONTENU CIBLÉ | [2010/38] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 07.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.05.2016 | 09.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/40] | 10.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.05.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0141022 (AMAZING MEDIA INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * figures 2C,3A,3B * * page 7, line 3 - page 10, line 15 * * page 20, line 2 - page 23, line 18 *; | [I]US2004073538 (LEISHMAN PETER [CH], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0081] *; | [I]US2005091111 (GREEN JASON W [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-25 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0225] *; | [I]US7028072 (KLIGER SCOTT A [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2006200308 (ARUTUNIAN ETHAN B [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2,3,4A,4D,5B * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0060] *; | [I]US2007050253 (BIGGS JODY D [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1A,1B, 7, 8, 9, 12A, 12B, 13A, 13B, 14, 15, 16, 17 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0090] *; | [I] - MESSAGE MEDIA, "VirtualTAG Technology from First Virtual Holdings used in online ad for AT&T WorldNet Service", INTERNET CITATION, (19970610), URL: http://www.messagemedia.com/company/press/97_second/release97_06_10.html, (19990205), XP002093852 [I] 1-15 * page 1 - page 2, line 2 * | International search | [A]US6034661 (SERVAN-SCHREIBER FRANKLIN [US], et al); | [Y]KR20010088131 (ELSTECH CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]US2005021397 (CUI YINGWEI CLAIRE [US], et al); | [A]US2006039655 (WILSON ROBERT E [US]) | by applicant | WO0141022 | US2004073538 | US2005091111 | US7028072 | US2006200308 | US2007050253 |