EP2242643 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CRUMPLING PAPER SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pregis Innovative Packaging Inc. 1650 Lake Cook Road Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WETSCH, Thomas, D. 1503 Keim Court St. Charles IL 60174 / US | 02 /
TEGEL, Robert 11603 Second Street Huntley IL 60142 / US | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09701427.8 | 09.01.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009US30576 | Priority number, date | US20080008166 | 09.01.2008 Original published format: US 8166 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009089431 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2242643 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B31D5/00, // B65H35/00 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
B31D5/0052 (EP,US);
B65H35/008 (EP,US);
B31D2205/0023 (EP,US);
B31D2205/0047 (EP,US);
B31D2205/0058 (EP,US);
B31D2205/007 (EP,US);
B31D2205/0082 (EP,US);
B31D2205/0094 (EP,US);
B65H2801/63 (EP,US);
Y10S493/967 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/43] | B31F1/12, B31F1/10, B31F1/07, B31F1/00, B65H35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZERKNITTERN VON PAPIERSUBSTRATEN | [2010/43] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CRUMPLING PAPER SUBSTRATES | [2010/43] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FROISSEMENT DE SUBSTRATS DE PAPIER | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 19.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/14] | 23.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/14] | Divisional application(s) | EP17177898.8 / EP3251824 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6168560 (PLUYMAEKERS SERGE H L C [NL], et al) [X] 1,3-5,15 * column 6, line 8 - line 22 * * column 9, line 36 - line 51 * * column 11, line 9 - column 12, line 13; figures 1A, 1B, 2, 5-9 * [A] 2; | [XA]US5989176 (RATZEL RICHARD O [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * column 7, line 28 - column 8, line 48; figures 8-10 * [A] 2; | [XA]EP1814787 (RANPAK CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024]; figures 3-6 * [A] 2 | International search | [X]WO9529055 (NATUREMBAL SA [FR], et al); | [A]JPH081837 (WATANABE TOKUJI); | [A]KR20020073610 (JUNG YEUN GAK [KR]) |