EP2243722 - CIGARETTE PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKANO, Keiko c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 2-1 Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | 02 /
MIYAZAWA, Akira c/o JT Design Center CO. LTD. 2-1 Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | [2013/30] |
Former [2010/43] | 01 /
NAKANO, Keiko c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 2-1 Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAZAWA, Akira c/o JT Design Center CO. LTD. 2-1 Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/43] | Peckmann, Ralf Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09701545.7 | 09.01.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009JP50220 | Priority number, date | JP20080009199 | 18.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008009199 | [2010/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009090918 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2243722 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2243722 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/10, A24F15/00, B65D5/49, B65D25/04 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
B65D25/04 (EP,KR,US);
B65D85/1009 (EP,KR,US);
B65D43/20 (KR);
Y02W30/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | ZIGARETTENPACKUNG | [2010/43] | English: | CIGARETTE PACKAGE | [2010/43] | French: | PAQUET DE CIGARETTES | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2010 | Translation filed | 30.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 22.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2009 | BG | 24.07.2013 | CY | 24.07.2013 | CZ | 24.07.2013 | DK | 24.07.2013 | EE | 24.07.2013 | FI | 24.07.2013 | HR | 24.07.2013 | LT | 24.07.2013 | LV | 24.07.2013 | MC | 24.07.2013 | MK | 24.07.2013 | MT | 24.07.2013 | PL | 24.07.2013 | SI | 24.07.2013 | SK | 24.07.2013 | NO | 24.10.2013 | IS | 24.11.2013 | PT | 25.11.2013 | LU | 09.01.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.01.2009 | |
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
LU | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 24.07.2013 | |
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
LU | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
MT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
LU | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
LU | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 24.07.2013 | |
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
HR | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 24.07.2013 | |
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 24.07.2013 | |
NO | 24.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 24.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]BE636793 (OTTELOHE J.R.) [Y] 5-7 * page 5, line 4 - line 9; figure 11 *; | [A]US1540553 (GRAHAM ANDREW W) [A] 4 * figures 2,5 *; | [XY]US2006591 (FOX ANSLEY H) [X] 1-4,8 * figures 1-3,6,9 * [Y] 5-7,9; | [A]GB504584 (FREDERICK HENRY CANN) [A] 4 * figure 3 *; | [A]FR1081649 (LA CHIUSA ARTURO) [A] 5 * figure 4 *; | [Y]US2928571 (CARUSO PAUL B) [Y] 9* column 10, line 69 - line 75; figure 11 * | International search | [A]US2021755 (FRED SPITALNY); | [A]US4300675 (WAGNER HANS-RUEDI); | [Y]JPH0356520U (JAPAN TOBACCO INC.); | [Y]JPH03212386 (FOCKE & CO); | [Y]US5992621 (GRANT DONALD F [CA], et al); | [A]JP2004515426 (JI.DE S.P.A.) | by applicant | JPH04213340 |