EP2257899 - REDUCING THE SIZE OF A MODEL USING VISIBILITY FACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation 300 Baker Avenue Concord MA 01742 / US | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEGDOUN, Olivier 203 Lakeview Avenue Tyngsborough MA 01879 / US | 02 /
HOLWAY, Bruce, W. 117 Landing Drive Brewster MA 02631 / US | 03 /
MANDLOI, Amit 381 Old Beaverbrook Acton MA 01718 / US | 04 /
KRISHNAMURTHY, Adarsh 1945 Berkeley Way Apt. 106 Berkeley CA 94704 / US | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Bandpay & Greuter 17, rue de Vaucouleurs 75011 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/49] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09701759.4 | 15.01.2009 | [2010/49] | WO2009US00258 | Priority number, date | US20080021775P | 17.01.2008 Original published format: US 21775 P | [2011/17] |
Former [2010/49] | US20080021775 | 17.01.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009091571 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2257899 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50, G06T17/00, G06T15/00 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
G06T15/40 (EP,US);
G06F30/00 (EP,US);
G06T17/00 (EP,US);
G06T17/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | VERRINGERUNG DER GRÖSSE EINES MODELLS UNTER VERWENDUNG VON VISIBILITÄTSFAKTOREN | [2010/49] | English: | REDUCING THE SIZE OF A MODEL USING VISIBILITY FACTORS | [2010/49] | French: | RÉDUCTION DE LA DIMENSION D'UN MODÈLE À L'AIDE DE FACTEURS DE VISIBILITÉ | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 04.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/01] | 23.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/01] | 23.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2019 | 21.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.06.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.06.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2011 | 31.01.2019 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007291029 (KONEV MAX [NZ], et al) [X] 1-6,10-13,18-20 * column A * * figures 3,5 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0039] *; | [PX]US2008024507 (PELLETIER-DOYLE JOSEPH E [US], et al) [PX] 1-6,10-13,18-20 * column A *; | [A]WO0019381 (SOLIDWORKS CORP [US]) [A] 8,9,14 * abstract * * page 16, line 15 - page 18, line 22 * * page 25, line 24 - page 26, line 6 * * page 31, line 1 - line 23 * | [X] - BEAT BRÜDERLIN ET AL, "Interviews3D: A Platform for Interactive Handling of Massive Data Sets", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20071101), vol. 27, no. 6, ISSN 0272-1716, pages 48 - 59, XP011198998 [X] 1,11,18 * page 50, column 1, paragraph 4 - page 51, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 52, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 56, column 2, paragraphs 4,5 * | Examination | US2006250388 |