EP2242496 - METHODS FOR IN VITRO MATURATION OF OVARIAN FOLLICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liu, Kui Askims Svartmosseväg 36 436 39 Askim / SE | [2017/14] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states Liu, Kui Sjöfruvägen 99 907 51 Umeå / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/43] | Fagerlin, Heléne, et al Albihns.Zacco Valhallavägen 117 Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 09702221.4 | 19.01.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009SE50049 | Priority number, date | US20080021639 | 17.01.2008 Original published format: US 21639 | US20080024210 | 29.01.2008 Original published format: US 24210 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009091332 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2242496 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2242496 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/24, A61P15/08, A61P43/00, G01N33/573 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
A61B17/43 (US);
A61B17/435 (US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/8776 (US);
C12N5/0609 (US);
C12N5/0682 (US);
C12Q1/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/14] |
Former [2010/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IN-VITRO-REIFUNG VON OVARIALFOLLIKELN | [2010/43] | English: | METHODS FOR IN VITRO MATURATION OF OVARIAN FOLLICLES | [2010/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE MATURATION IN VITRO DE FOLLICULES OVARIENS | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 16.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 25.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2009 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 19.01.2009 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CUMMINGS CATHY ET AL, "A peroxovanadium compound induces Xenopus oocyte maturation: Inhibition by a neutralizing anti-insulin receptor antibody", DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 175, no. 2, ISSN 0012-1606, pages 338 - 346, XP002630582 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 340, columns l-h, paragraph l - columns r-h, paragraph 2; figure 1 * * page 343, columns r-h, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/dbio.1996.0119 | International search | [Y]WO2005019440 (NORTH SYDNEY AREA HEALTH SERV [AU], et al); | [X] - SCHMID, ANNETTE C. ET AL., "Bisperoxovanadium compounds are potent PTEN inhibitors", FEBS LETTERS, (2004), pages 35 - 38, XP008155698 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2004.03.102 | [X] - ROSIVATZ, E. ET AL., "A small-molecule inhibitor for phasphatase and tensin homologue deleted on chromosome 10 (PTEN)", ACS CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 1, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1021/CB60352F, pages 780 - 790, XP003025184 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/CB60352F | [Y] - HSU, S.-Y. ET AL., "Synergistic induction of ovulation and prostaglandin synthesis in goldfish (carassius auratus) follicles by sodium orthovanadate and hydrogen peroxide", BIOLOGY OF REPRODUCTION, (1991), vol. 45, doi:doi:10.1095/biolreprod45.6.912, pages 912 - 917, XP003025185 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1095/biolreprod45.6.912 | [Y] - POSNER, B. I. ET AL., "Peroxovanadium compounds", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 269, no. 6, pages 4596 - 4604, XP008155700 | [YP] - FAN, H.-Y. ET AL., "Targeted disruption of Pten in ovarian granulosa cells enhances ovulation and extends the life span of luteal cells", MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2008), vol. 22, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1210/ME.2008-0095, pages 2128 - 2140, XP003025186 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/ME.2008-0095 | [YP] - REDDY, P. ET AL., "Oocyte-specific deletion of Pten causes premature activation of the primordial follicle pool", SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 319, doi:doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1152257, pages 611 - 613, XP003025187 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/SCIENCE.1152257 | [A] - GOETZ, F. W., "Involvement of Protein Kinase C in Agonist-Stimulated Goldfish Ovulation", BIOLOGY OF REPRODUCTION, (1993), vol. 48, doi:doi:10.1095/biolreprod48.4.846, pages 846 - 850, XP003025188 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1095/biolreprod48.4.846 | [A] - CHANG, K. J. ET AL., "Differential effects of gonadotropin and orthovanadate on oocyte maturation, ovulation and prostaglandin synthesis by rana ovarian follicles in vitro", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL ZOOLOGY, (1997), vol. 277, pages 155 - 165, XP003025189 | [A] - HSU, S.-Y. ET AL., "Oxoanions stimulate in vitro ovulation and signal transduction pathways in goldfish (Carrasius auratus) follicles", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY (ENDOCRINOL. METAB. 26), (1992), vol. 263, pages E943 - E949 | [A] - HAINAUT, P. ET AL., "Insulin-like effects of vanadate on glucose uptake and on maturation in Xenopus laevis oocytes", CELL REGULATION, (1991), vol. 2, pages 317 - 327, XP003025190 | [A] - MAILHES, J. B. ET AL., "Vanadate, an inhibitor of tyrosine phosphatases, induced premauture anaphase in oocytes and aneuploidy and polyploidy in mouse bone marrow cells", MUTATION RESEARCH, (2003), vol. 538, doi:doi:10.1016/S1383-5718(03)00108-6, pages 101 - 107, XP003025191 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1383-5718(03)00108-6 |