EP2231440 - TRIGGERING DEVICE FOR A HORN SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states paragon AG Schwalbenweg 29 33129 Delbrück / DE | For all designated states TAKATA - PETRI AG Bahnweg 1 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | [2011/33] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states paragon AG Schwalbenweg 29 33129 Delbrück / DE | ||
For all designated states Takata-Petri AG Bahnweg 1 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖCKSTIEGEL, Andreas Bachstrasse 58 33813 Oerlinghausen / DE | 02 /
HANS, Andreas Ringstrasse 25 63843 Niedernberg / DE | 03 /
KEMPF, Bernhard Untere Gasse 6 63839 Kleinwallstadt / DE | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Lelgemann, Karl-Heinz Patentanwälte Spalthoff und Lelgemann Huyssenallee 70/72 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | Lelgemann, Karl-Heinz Patentanwälte Spalthoff und Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 45074 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2010/39] | Lelgemann, Karl-Heinz Patentanwälte Spalthoff und Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 45074 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09702320.4 | 13.01.2009 | [2010/39] | WO2009EP00132 | Priority number, date | DE20081004984 | 17.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008004984 | [2010/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009090031 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2231440 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2231440 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q5/00 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
B60Q5/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | AUSLÖSEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE HUPANLAGE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2010/39] | English: | TRIGGERING DEVICE FOR A HORN SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2010/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉCLENCHEMENT POUR UN SYSTÈME D'AVERTISSEUR SONORE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 23.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2009 | CY | 31.08.2011 | CZ | 31.08.2011 | DK | 31.08.2011 | EE | 31.08.2011 | FI | 31.08.2011 | HR | 31.08.2011 | IE | 31.08.2011 | IT | 31.08.2011 | LT | 31.08.2011 | LV | 31.08.2011 | MK | 31.08.2011 | MT | 31.08.2011 | NL | 31.08.2011 | PL | 31.08.2011 | RO | 31.08.2011 | SE | 31.08.2011 | SI | 31.08.2011 | SK | 31.08.2011 | TR | 31.08.2011 | BG | 30.11.2011 | NO | 30.11.2011 | GR | 01.12.2011 | ES | 11.12.2011 | IS | 31.12.2011 | PT | 02.01.2012 | LU | 13.01.2012 | BE | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
TR | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
LU | 13.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
TR | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
IT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
IE | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | CY | 31.08.2011 | |
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4016047 (BAYERN CHEMIE GMBH FLUGCHEMIE [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 38 * * column 4, lines 9-46 * * figure - *; | [A]US5965952 (PODOLOFF ROBERT MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0064710 (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2863564 (SC2N SA [FR]) [A] 1-6* the whole document * |