EP2242468 - THERAPEUTIC MICRO-VIBRATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Milne, Robert 2110 Pinto Lane Las Vegas, NV 89106 / US | For all designated states Spawr, Walter J. 2051 Spawr Circle Lake Havasu City, AZ 86403 / US | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | South, Nicholas Geoffrey AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | South, Nicholas Geoffrey A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 09702421.0 | 14.01.2009 | [2010/43] | WO2009US30953 | Priority number, date | US20080009087 | 15.01.2008 Original published format: US 9087 | US20080009015 | 15.01.2008 Original published format: US 9015 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009091799 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2242468 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61H7/00, A61H23/02 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
A61H23/0263 (EP,US);
A61H7/001 (EP,US);
A61H15/0092 (EP,US);
A61H2201/10 (EP,US);
A61H2201/501 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5043 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5097 (EP,US);
A61H23/0236 (EP,US);
A61N2/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/43] | A61H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE MIKROSCHWINGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2010/43] | English: | THERAPEUTIC MICRO-VIBRATION DEVICE | [2010/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF THÉRAPEUTIQUE DE MICRO-VIBRATION | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 03.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 27.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9939764 (AN BYUNG YUL [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-9,13,15-18 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 10; figure - * [I] 3,10-12,14; | [XI]KR20010083578 (AN BYUNG YUL [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-9,13,15-18 * abstract * [I] 3,10-12,14; | [XI]US5562706 (LAUTERBACH ANTONIN [CZ] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4-8,13,15-18 * column 2, lines 13-53; figure - * [I] 3,9-12,14 | International search | [X]WO2006118608 (MILNE ET AL); | [Y]US2004171970 (SCHLEUNIGER ET AL); | [Y]US2005182389 (LAPORTE ET AL); | [Y]EP1829580 (BROWN); | [Y]US2005108057 (COHEN ET AL.); | [Y]US6547713 (TALPO); | [A]US2003045770 (VAN MULLEKOM) |