EP2229482 - EQUIPMENT FOR DRILLING SECANT HOLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Change - PCT data | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soilmec S.p.A. Via Dismano 5819 47023 Cesena (FO) / IT | [2010/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEPI, Maurizio Via Decio Raggi 62 I-47020 Longiano (FO) / IT | [2010/38] | Representative(s) | Di Gennaro, Sergio, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Di Gennaro, Sergio, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2010/38] | Lotti, Giorgio Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 09702892.2 | 13.01.2009 | [2010/38] | WO2009EP00145 | Priority number, date | IT2008TO00025 | 14.01.2008 Original published format: IT TO20080025 | [2010/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009090034 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2229482 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E02D5/18 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
E02D5/18 (EP,KR,US);
E02D5/34 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/38] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM BOHREN VON SICH SCHNEIDENDEN LÖCHERN | [2010/38] | English: | EQUIPMENT FOR DRILLING SECANT HOLES | [2010/38] | French: | EQUIPEMENT POUR FORER DES TROUS SÉCANTS | [2010/38] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 28.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Divisional application(s) | EP11186546.5 / EP2434057 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0580264 (BEHEERMAATSCHAPPIJ VERSTRAETEN [NL]) [X] 1,2,7,14 * column 2, line 41 - column 5, line 42 * |