EP2236547 - SURFACE-TREATED FIBER, RESIN COMPOSITION, AND MOLDED ARTICLE OF THE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0033 / JP | For all designated states Teijin Limited 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | [2014/18] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0033 / JP | ||
For all designated states Teijin Fibers Limited 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0054 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITANO, Katsuhisa E10-4, Rabigh Refining & Petrochemical Co. Community Rabigh 21911 / SA | 02 /
WATANABE, Kenji 1-9-2325 Yushudainishi Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0125 / JP | 03 /
ATARASHI, Kenji 829-28 Izumi Kimitsu-shi Chiba 299-1112 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Shinichi c/o Osaka Research Center Teijin Limited 4-1 Minohara 3-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0006 / JP | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09703109.0 | 22.01.2009 | [2010/40] | WO2009JP51387 | Priority number, date | JP20080013517 | 24.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008013517 | [2010/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009093748 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2236547 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/06, C08J3/12, D06M15/227, D06M15/564, D06M101/32, C08J5/04, C08K7/02, C08K9/08, D06M15/263, D06M15/55 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
D06M15/55 (EP,US);
B29C48/04 (EP,US);
C08J5/046 (EP,US);
C08J5/06 (EP,US);
D06M15/227 (EP,US);
D06M15/263 (EP,US);
D06M15/564 (EP,US);
B29C45/0005 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
C08J2351/06 (EP,US);
C08K7/02 (EP,US);
C08K9/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/40] | C08J5/06, C08J3/12, D06M15/227, D06M15/564, D06M101/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTE FASER, HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMARTIKEL AUS DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2010/40] | English: | SURFACE-TREATED FIBER, RESIN COMPOSITION, AND MOLDED ARTICLE OF THE COMPOSITION | [2010/40] | French: | FIBRE TRAITÉE EN SURFACE, COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ET ARTICLE MOULÉ DE LA COMPOSITION | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2010 | Translation filed | 11.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 22.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2006233379 ; | [Y]US2004002569 (KITANO KATSUHISA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0030] - [0038] *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 65, Database accession no. 2006-624099, XP002688989 & JP2006233379 A 20060907 (TEIJIN FIBER KK) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2004083638 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JP2005082786 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [Y]JP2006008995 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JP2006233379 (TEIJIN TECHNO PRODUCTS LTD) | by applicant | JPS61287917 | JPH03121146 | JPH03272830 | JPH04323207 | JP2001049012 | JP2002005924 | JP2002308947 | JP2004197068 | JP2004217753 | JP2004217754 | JP2004292581 | JP2005272754 | JP2006008995 | JP2006233379 | - PROG. POLYM,. SCI., (1999), vol. 24, pages 81 - 142 | - A. ZAMBELLI, MACROMOLECULES, (1973), vol. 6, page 925 | - MACROMOLECULES, (1975), vol. 8, page 687 |