EP2238641 - REDOX FUEL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/41] | FUEL CELLS | ||
[2012/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acal Energy Limited The Heath Business and Technical Park Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Acal Energy Limited The Health Business and Technical Park Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNUCKEY, Kathryn 4 Fletchers Drive Ormskirk Lancashire L40 5UY / GB | 02 /
ROCHESTER, David 3 Pimlico Road Hetton-le-Hole Tyne&Wear DH5 0EX / GB | [2012/36] |
Former [2010/41] | 01 /
KNUCKEY, Kathryn 4 Fletchers Drive Ormskirk Lancashire L40 5UY / GB | ||
02 /
ROCHESTER, David 3 Pimlico Road Hetton-le-Hole Tyne&Wear DH5 0EX / GB | Representative(s) | Brand, Thomas Louis WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Brand, Thomas Louis WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/41] | Brand, Thomas Louis W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09703187.6 | 23.01.2009 | [2010/41] | WO2009GB50065 | Priority number, date | GB20080001198 | 23.01.2008 Original published format: GB 0801198 | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009093080 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2238641 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2238641 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/18 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
H01M8/188 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/41] | H01M8/18, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/41] | Title | German: | REDOX-BRENNSTOFFZELLEN | [2012/10] | English: | REDOX FUEL CELLS | [2012/10] | French: | PILES À COMBUSTIBLE RÉDOX | [2012/10] |
Former [2010/41] | BRENNSTOFFZELLEN | ||
Former [2010/41] | FUEL CELLS | ||
Former [2010/41] | PILES À COMBUSTIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 24.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2009 | AT | 05.09.2012 | BE | 05.09.2012 | CY | 05.09.2012 | CZ | 05.09.2012 | DK | 05.09.2012 | EE | 05.09.2012 | FI | 05.09.2012 | HR | 05.09.2012 | IT | 05.09.2012 | LT | 05.09.2012 | LV | 05.09.2012 | MK | 05.09.2012 | MT | 05.09.2012 | NL | 05.09.2012 | PL | 05.09.2012 | RO | 05.09.2012 | SE | 05.09.2012 | SI | 05.09.2012 | SK | 05.09.2012 | TR | 05.09.2012 | BG | 05.12.2012 | NO | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.12.2012 | ES | 16.12.2012 | IS | 05.01.2013 | PT | 07.01.2013 | IE | 23.01.2013 | LU | 23.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MK | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
TR | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
MT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
IE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CY | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
IT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
DK | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
BG | 05.12.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
PT | 07.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
PL | 05.09.2012 | ||
RO | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
SK | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.09.2012 | ||
EE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
NL | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.12.2012 | ||
IS | 05.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
BE | 05.09.2012 | ||
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SE | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
LV | 05.09.2012 | ||
SI | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
HR | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
FI | 05.09.2012 | ||
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 05.09.2012 | |
LT | 05.09.2012 | ||
NO | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5642970 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN) [A] 1-43* abstract *; | [A]JPS6215770 (UNIV YAMAGUCHI) [A] 1-43 * abstract *; | [A]US5683829 (SARANGAPANI SHANTHA [US]) [A] 1-43 * column 2, lines 11-21,55-58; figures 1A-1L * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 21 * * claims 1,2,5,7,8,11 *; | [A]WO2006097438 (ACAL ENERGY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-43 * page 4, lines 7-25 * * page 12, line 19 - page 13, line 25 * * claim 1 *; | [PDX]WO2008009993 (ACAL ENERGY LTD [GB], et al) [PDX] 1-43 * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 13 * * page 10, line 16 - page 12, line 11 * * page 12, line 24 - page 16, line 17 * * examples 8-17 * * claims 1-4,8,11-18,25,26 * |