EP2245192 - DETECTION OF GSTP1 HYPERMETHYLATION IN PROSTATE CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veridex, LLC 1001 US Highway 202 North Raritan, NJ 08869 / US | [2010/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZUMDER, Abhijit 35 Carlisle Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07970 / US | 02 /
VARDE, Shobha, A. 14558 Millhopper Road Jacksonville, FL 32258 / US | 03 /
VARGO, Janet, M. 1213 Evergreen Drive Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 04 /
BADEN, Jonathan, F. 204 Brokaw Court Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09703303.9 | 19.01.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009US31379 | Priority number, date | US20080022600P | 22.01.2008 Original published format: US 22600 P | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009094312 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2245192 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2523/125 (KR);
C12Q2537/164 (KR);
C12Q2600/154 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | NACHWEIS VON GSTP1-HYPERMETHYLIERUNG BEI PROSTATAKREBS | [2010/44] | English: | DETECTION OF GSTP1 HYPERMETHYLATION IN PROSTATE CANCER | [2010/44] | French: | DÉTECTION D'UNE HYPERMÉTHYLATION DE GSTP1 DANS UN CANCER DE LA PROSTATE | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 14.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/49] | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9955905 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [X] 1-16 * see whole dco. esp. example 2. *; | [I]WO03044232 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS MED [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2004086949 (WAYNE JOHN CANCER INST [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * see whole doc. esp. claims and p.34 *; | [XP]EP1980856 (VERIDEX LLC [US]) [XP] 1-16* see whole doc. esp. seq id 4 *; | [X] - NAKAYAMA MASASHI ET AL, "GSTP1 CpG island hypermethylation as a molecular biomarker for prostate cancer.", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY 15 FEB 2004 LNKD- PUBMED:14755684, (20040215), vol. 91, no. 3, ISSN 0730-2312, pages 540 - 552, XP002625951 [X] 1-16 * see whole doc., esp. p.542 and Fig.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/JCB.10740 | [X] - BERNARDINI S ET AL, "Hypermethylation of the CpG islands in the promoter region of the GSTP1 gene in prostate cancer: a useful diagnostic and prognostic marker?", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20041201), vol. 350, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.CCCN.2004.07.022, ISSN 0009-8981, pages 181 - 188, XP004629826 [X] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cccn.2004.07.022 | International search | [Y]US2006240460 (PFEIFER GERD P [US], et al); | [Y]US2006269937 (CLARK SUSAN J [AU], et al); | [X]US2007059753 (VENER TATIANA [US], et al); | [Y]US2007065859 (WANG YIXIN [US], et al) |