EP2249279 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/45] | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, DISC, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | ||
[2015/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Kenjiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
OISHI, Tateo c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
MURAMATSU, Katsumi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
KATO, Motoki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
KOBAYASHI, Yoshiyuki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2016/12] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
UEDA, Kenjiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
02 /
OISHI, Tateo c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
03 /
MURAMATSU, Katsumi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
04 /
KATO, Motoki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | |||
05 /
KOBAYASHI, Yoshiyuki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-Ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2016/12] |
Former [2010/45] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09703470.6 | 20.01.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009JP50750 | Priority number, date | JP20080010187 | 21.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008010187 | JP20080010188 | 21.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008010188 | [2010/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009093571 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2249279 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2249279 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00, G06F21/62, H04L9/32 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
G06F21/6209 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00427 (EP,US);
H04L9/321 (EP,US);
H04L9/3268 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/01] | G11B20/00, H04L9/32, G06F21/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/45] | G06F21/22, G06F21/24, G06Q30/00, G06Q50/00, G09C1/00, H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2010/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2015/41] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2015/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2015/41] |
Former [2010/45] | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG, DATENTRÄGER, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | ||
Former [2010/45] | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, DISC, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | ||
Former [2010/45] | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, DISQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2010 | Translation filed | 14.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 13.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2009 | AT | 23.03.2016 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | IT | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 20.01.2009 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 20.01.2009 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 20.01.2009 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.01.2009 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
IT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006073252 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]; KIM KUN SUK [KR]) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6766353 (LIN JYH-HAN [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-19 * column 3, lines 21-64 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2007133944 (TAKASHIMA YOSHIKAZU [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0102] - [0112] * * figures 1,5-7 *; | [A]EP1791121 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0209] - [0238] * * figures 21-27 *; | [A] - Intel Corporation Et Al., "Advanced Access Content System (AACS), Blu-ray Disc Pre-recorded Book, Revision 0.92", (20071205), page COMPLETE, URL: http://www.aacsla.com/specifications/AACS_Spec_BD_Prerecorded_0.92.pdf, (20111116), XP055012339 [A] 1-19 * pages 5-12 * * pages 49-68 * | [A] - Intel corporation et al, "Advanced Access Content System (AACS) Pre-recorded Video Book Revision 0.92", INTERNET CITATION, (20071129), page COMPLETE, URL: http://www.aacsla.com/specifications/AACS_Spec_Prerecorded_0.92.pdf, (20100208), XP007911576 [A] 1-19 * pages 5-15 * | International search | [A]JP2005328198 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2006050355 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]WO2006085647 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2007157308 (SONY CORP) |