EP2245346 - CARTRIDGE FOR A SANITARY FITTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CeramTec GmbH CeramTec-Platz 1-9 73207 Plochingen / DE | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states CeramTec AG Fabrikstrasse 23-29 73207 Plochingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRIST, Frank Koblenzer Str. 18 54538 Bausendorf / DE | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Uppena, Franz, et al Patente, Marken & Lizenzen c/o Chemetall GmbH Trakehner Straße 3 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/44] | Hübner, Günter Chemetall GmbH Patente, Marken & Lizenzen Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 09703636.2 | 19.01.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009EP50548 | Priority number, date | DE20081000108 | 21.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008000108 | [2010/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009092687 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2245346 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2245346 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/078, F16K31/60 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
F16K11/0787 (EP,US);
F16K31/605 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87571 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | KARTUSCHE FÜR EINE SANITÄRARMATUR | [2010/44] | English: | CARTRIDGE FOR A SANITARY FITTING | [2010/44] | French: | CARTOUCHE POUR UN APPAREIL SANITAIRE | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 23.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2009 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | HR | 15.08.2012 | IT | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | MK | 15.08.2012 | MT | 15.08.2012 | NL | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | NO | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | ES | 26.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | GB | 19.01.2013 | IE | 19.01.2013 | LU | 19.01.2013 | BE | 31.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | FR | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MK | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
GB | 19.01.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
GB | 19.01.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
GB | 19.01.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
GB | 19.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 15.08.2012 | |
NO | 15.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE9012682U (KO, HSI-CHIA, LU KANG CHEN, CHANGHUA, TW) [X] 1,7-14 * page 4, line 7 - page 7, line 28; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP0143058 (CATANY RIGO BERNARDO) [X] 1,7-14 * page 2, line 31 - page 4, line 31; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE8907729U (KNEBEL & ROETTGER GMBH & CO, 5860 ISERLOHN, DE) [A] 1,7-14 * page 17, paragraph 2; figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]DE4028450 (SCHULTE & SOHN HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 1,7-14 * column 3, lines 34-44; figure 1 * |