EP2244650 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RESHAPING AN EYE FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avedro, INC. 230 Third Avenue Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2010/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULLER, David 87 Chestnut Street Boston MA 02108 / US | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09703726.1 | 22.01.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009US31715 | Priority number, date | US20080018473 | 23.01.2008 Original published format: US 18473 | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009094467 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2244650 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18, A61B18/14 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
A61F9/013 (EP,US);
A61B18/14 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00853 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00872 (EP,US);
A61F9/0079 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/44] | A61B18/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR UMGESTALTUNG EINES AUGENMERKMALS | [2010/44] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RESHAPING AN EYE FEATURE | [2010/44] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE REFORMER UN ÉLÉMENT DE L'OEIL | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 11.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 28.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.04.2011 | 31.01.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2012 | 31.01.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007022993 (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE], et al) [Y] 12,13* page 14, line 26 - page 15, line 3 *; | [XYI]US7192429 (TREMBLY B STUART [US]) [X] 1,3-8,10,11,14,15 * column 1, line 32 - line 40 * * column 3, line 7 - line 9 * * column 4, line 4 - line 35 * * column 5, line 5 - line 8 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 31 * * column 7, line 6 - line 39 * * column 8, line 24 - line 60 * * column 9, line 39 - line 45 * * column 10, line 23 - line 28 * [Y] 12,13 [I] 2,9 | International search | [Y]US6342053 (BERRY MICHAEL J [US]); | [Y]US2002049437 (SILVESTRINI THOMAS A [US]); | [X]US7192429 (TREMBLY B STUART [US]); | [Y]US2007244470 (BARKER JR BOYD T [US], et al) |