01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
27.09.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
15.03.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
06.04.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] |
05.04.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
05.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.03.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.12.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.12.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.12.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.09.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.08.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
04.08.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
04.08.2017 |
Change - German title |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
04.08.2017 |
Change - English title |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
04.08.2017 |
Change - French title |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
15.03.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.12.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.09.2015 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.05.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.11.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.07.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.07.2014 |
First examination report |
|
31.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.11.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
28.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
18.02.2011 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
28.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
17.12.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
13.12.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.09.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.09.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.08.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|