Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015157803 | ![]() | 11.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84233710 | 23.07.2010 | WO2009EP50797 | 23.01.2009 | US201514627024 | 20.02.2015 | US86427910 | 29.10.2010 | US2709908 | 08.02.2008 | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8992484 | ![]() | 31.03.2015 | B2 | US2011046565 | 24.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84233710 | 23.07.2010 | WO2009EP50797 | 23.01.2009 | US2709908 | 08.02.2008 | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8348905 | ![]() | 08.01.2013 | B2 | US2011034878 | 10.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86427909 | 23.01.2009 | WO2009EP50797 | 23.01.2009 | US2709908 | 08.02.2008 | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5475689B | ![]() | 16.04.2014 | B2 | JP2011509783 | 31.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP50797 | 23.01.2009 | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2711653 | ![]() | 05.07.2016 | C | CA2711653 | 30.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP50797 | 23.01.2009 | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010203117B | ![]() | 01.05.2014 | B2 | AU2010203117 | 12.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP50797 | 23.01.2009 | AU2009207646 | 23.01.2009 | AU2010203117 | 21.07.2010 | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010203114B | ![]() | 04.07.2013 | B2 | AU2010203114 | 12.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP50797 | 23.01.2009 | AU2010203114 | 21.07.2010 | AU2009207646 | 23.01.2009 | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010203113B | ![]() | 20.06.2013 | B2 | AU2010203113 | 12.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP50797 | 23.01.2009 | AU2009207646 | 23.01.2009 | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | AU2010203113 | 21.07.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009207646B | ![]() | 09.05.2013 | B2 | AU2009207646 | 30.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP50797 | 23.01.2009 | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2244768 | ![]() | 03.04.2019 | B1 | EP2244768 | 03.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09703907 | 23.01.2009 | WO2009EP50797 | 23.01.2009 | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0907182 | 22.02.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP50797 | 23.01.2009 | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101925374B | 26.11.2014 | B | CN101925374 | 22.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP50797 | 23.01.2009 | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2491102 | 27.08.2013 | C2 | RU2010133625 | 27.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP50797 | 23.01.2009 | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009092807 | ![]() | 30.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5467114B | ![]() | 09.04.2014 | B2 | JP2012110733 | 14.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5362048B | ![]() | 11.12.2013 | B2 | JP2012110732 | 14.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5362047B | ![]() | 11.12.2013 | B2 | JP2012110731 | 14.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0923665 | 25.12.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0923666 | 25.12.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0923667 | 25.12.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101912648B | 24.04.2013 | B | CN101912648 | 15.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101912649B | 17.07.2013 | B | CN101912649 | 15.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101912650B | 26.12.2012 | B | CN101912650 | 15.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2010140993 | 20.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2556965 | 20.07.2015 | C2 | RU2010140996 | 20.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2552306 | 10.06.2015 | C2 | RU2010141000 | 20.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08150533 | 23.01.2008 |