EP2246833 - MUSICAL CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iglesias Alvaro-Gracia, Jaime Rodrigo de Guevara 6-4° izquierda 28005 Madrid / ES | [2010/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Gonzalez Palmero, Fé Calle Sagasta, 4 28004 Madrid / ES | [2010/44] | Application number, filing date | 09704094.3 | 23.01.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009ES00033 | Priority number, date | ES20080000181 | 24.01.2008 Original published format: ES 200800181 | [2010/44] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009092839 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | ES | [2009/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2246833 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 30.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G09B15/02, G10G1/00, G10H1/34, G10H1/00 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
G10H1/0016 (EP,US);
G09B15/02 (EP,ES,US);
G10G1/00 (EP,ES,US);
G10H1/0066 (EP,US);
G10H1/34 (ES);
G10H2220/015 (EP,US);
G10H2220/026 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/44] | G09B15/02, G10G1/00, G10H1/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | MUSIK-STEUERUNG | [2010/44] | English: | MUSICAL CONTROLLER | [2010/44] | French: | CONTRÔLEUR MUSICAL | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2010 | Translation filed | 29.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 24.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR451411 (PIERRE GELIS [FR]); | [X]US1821311 (LAMP CHARLES J); | [A]GB442226 (THOMAS WILLIAM WHITE); | [XI]US3429216 (LAWRENCE SIDNEY J); | [X]US3429217 (LAWRENCE SIDNEY J); | [X]DE2847159 (GAZZOLA GIOVANNI); | [A]US4273023 (MERCER STANLEY L); | [X]US2006288842 (SITRICK DAVID H [US], et al) | International search | [A]GB428005 (ETHELBERT CLAUDE HARVEY); | [A]GB539987 (WILLIAM HENRY WILLMOTT, et al); | [Y]GB2091019 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC); | [Y]ES8407350 (CLAUDIO MEDRANO PEDRO [ES]) | Examination | US6121529 |