Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011020646 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86407709 | 22.01.2009 | WO2009US31731 | 22.01.2009 | US6235008 | 25.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011510894 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US31731 | 22.01.2009 | US6235008 | 25.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2238075 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2012 | A4 | EP2238075 | 13.10.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US31731 | 22.01.2009 | US6235008 | 25.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2712778 | 30.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US31731 | 22.01.2009 | US6235008 | 25.01.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101970350 | 09.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US31731 | 22.01.2009 | US6235008 | 25.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009094481 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2009 | A3 | WO2009094481 | 30.07.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US6235008 | 25.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100114530 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US6235008 | 25.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2010135375 | 27.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US6235008 | 25.01.2008 |