EP2238075 - NANODIAMONDS AND DIAMOND-LIKE PARTICLES FROM CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states West, J. Allen P.O. Box 1636 870 S. Dewey Road Dewey, AZ 86327 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states The Regents Of The University Of California 1111 Franklin Street 5th Floor Oakland CA 94607 / US | ||
For all designated states West, J. Allen P.O. Box 1636 870 S. Dewey Road Dewey, AZ 86327 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEST, J., Allen P.O. Box 1636 870 S. Dewey Road Dewey, AZ 86327 / US | 02 /
KENNETT, James 5830 La Goleta Road Goleta, CA 93117 / US | [2010/46] |
Former [2010/41] | 01 /
WEST, J., Allen P.O. Box 1636 870 S. Dewey Road Dewey, AZ 86327 / US | ||
02 /
KENNETT, James / US | Representative(s) | Ward, David Ian Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Ward, David Ian Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 09704451.5 | 22.01.2009 | [2010/41] | WO2009US31731 | Priority number, date | US20080062350P | 25.01.2008 Original published format: US 62350 P | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009094481 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2238075 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/06, B82B3/00, D01F9/12 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
D01F9/12 (EP,US);
C01B32/25 (KR);
B82Y40/00 (KR);
Y10T428/298 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/41] | C01B31/06, B82B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/41] | Title | German: | NANODIAMANTEN UND DIAMANTENÄHNLICHE PARTIKEL AUS KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGEM MATERIAL | [2010/41] | English: | NANODIAMONDS AND DIAMOND-LIKE PARTICLES FROM CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL | [2010/41] | French: | NANODIAMANTS ET PARTICULES DE CARBONE SOUS FORME DE DIAMANT AMORPHE PRODUITS À PARTIR D'UNE MATIÈRE CARBONÉE | [2010/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 08.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/42] | 29.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6045768 (BERGMANN OSWALD ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-5 * claims 8-11 *; | [A]US2007231245 (KUMASAKA NORIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2005131711 (NIPPON MICRO COATING KK); | [A]US2006121279 (PETRIK VIKTOR I [RU]); | [A]US2007148080 (LUEKING ANGELA [US], et al) |