EP2244859 - PRESSURISED AIR PICK DEVICE WITH VARIABLE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sullair Europe Zac Les Granges 42600 Montbrison / FR | [2010/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUCIG, Alain 20 la Source F-69630 Chaponost / FR | 02 /
CHARLAT, Patrice Le Poyet F-42111 Saint Didier sur Rochefort / FR | 03 /
LIOTIER, Julien 8 place Bouvier F-42600 Montbrison / FR | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/44] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09704622.1 | 13.01.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009FR50043 | Priority number, date | FR20080000201 | 15.01.2008 Original published format: FR 0800201 | [2010/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009092956 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2244859 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2244859 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B25D9/20 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
B25D9/20 (EP,US);
B25D9/04 (EP,US);
B25D2209/005 (EP,US);
B25D2250/035 (EP,US);
B25D2250/245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | DRUCKLUFTSCHLAGVORRICHTUNG MIT VARIABLER STEUERUNG | [2010/44] | English: | PRESSURISED AIR PICK DEVICE WITH VARIABLE CONTROL | [2010/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF PIQUEUR A AIR COMPRIME A COMMANDE VARIABLE | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 11.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2009 | AT | 07.12.2011 | CY | 07.12.2011 | CZ | 07.12.2011 | DK | 07.12.2011 | EE | 07.12.2011 | FI | 07.12.2011 | HR | 07.12.2011 | IE | 07.12.2011 | LT | 07.12.2011 | LV | 07.12.2011 | MK | 07.12.2011 | MT | 07.12.2011 | NL | 07.12.2011 | PL | 07.12.2011 | RO | 07.12.2011 | SE | 07.12.2011 | SI | 07.12.2011 | SK | 07.12.2011 | TR | 07.12.2011 | LU | 13.01.2012 | BE | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | BG | 07.03.2012 | NO | 07.03.2012 | GR | 08.03.2012 | IS | 07.04.2012 | PT | 09.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LU | 13.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MK | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MK | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
CZ | 07.12.2011 | ||
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
HR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 07.12.2011 | |
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 07.12.2011 | |
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
NO | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 07.12.2011 | |
NO | 07.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2254695 (FUEHRER GEORGE H) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]CH227392 (STAHLWERK MARK WENGERN AKTIENG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,2 * * the whole document *; | [A]US2415521 (MATTHEW O'FARRELL) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3060894 (DEAN JR ROBERT C, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document ** figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE1184304 (KORFMANN GMBH MASCHF) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2155842 (RIZHSKIJ POLT INST) [A] 1 * the whole document * |