EP2254582 - METHODS OF TREATING VIRAL INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chimerix, Inc. 2505 Meridian Parkway, Suite 340 Durham, NC 27713 / US | [2016/03] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Chimerix, Inc. 2505 Meridian Parkway, Suite 340 Durham, NC 27713 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANIER, Ernest Randall 316 Reade Road Chapel Hill North Carolina 27516 / US | 02 /
ALMOND, Merrick R. 1034 W. Sterlington Place Apex North Carolina 27502 / US | 03 /
PAINTER, George R. 129 Red Bud Lane Chapel Hill North Carolina 27514 / US | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | ||
Former [2013/15] | Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | ||
Former [2011/22] | Ireland, Jacqueline Frances Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | ||
Former [2010/48] | McNab, Donald C. Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09704809.4 | 23.01.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009US00447 | Priority number, date | US20080023633 | 25.01.2008 Original published format: US 23633 | US20080101810 | 01.10.2008 Original published format: US 101810 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009094190 | Date: | 30.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2254582 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2254582 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/675, A61P31/18, A61P1/16, A61K9/20, A61K9/48, A61K9/14, C07H19/00, A61K31/14 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2300/00 (US);
A61K31/706 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2010/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VIRUSINFEKTIONEN | [2010/48] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING VIRAL INFECTIONS | [2010/48] | French: | MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS VIRALES | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 05.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16151475.7 / EP3085377 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2009 | AT | 20.01.2016 | BE | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | CZ | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | FI | 20.01.2016 | HR | 20.01.2016 | LT | 20.01.2016 | LV | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | MK | 20.01.2016 | NL | 20.01.2016 | PL | 20.01.2016 | RO | 20.01.2016 | SE | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | IE | 23.01.2016 | LU | 23.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | IS | 20.05.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 23.01.2009 | |
AT | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
TR | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 23.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.01.2009 | |
AT | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
IE | 23.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
PL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 20.01.2016 | |
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | BE | 31.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004019232 (HOSTETLER KARL Y [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,9 * example 19; tables 5 and 6; §0135 * [Y] 1-15; | [A]WO2006017044 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [A] 10-15 * claims 8-12; §0010; §0030 *; | [X]WO2006076015 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-9 * comp. claims 14, 15 and p. 13, last §; table 2 *; | [XY]CN1810816 (INST OF MEDICINE BIOTECHNOLOGY [CN]) [X] 1,3,4,9 * p.8, table I; compounds of formulae I and II; last § of p. 8 * [Y] 1-15; | [X]WO2006110655 (CHIMERIX INC [US], et al) [X] 7,8 * claim 8; p. 3, l. 15; p. 10, l. 2 and p. 12, l. 4 *; | [XY] - PAINTER G R ET AL, "Evaluation of hexadecyloxypropyl-9-R-[2-(phosphonomethoxy)propyl]-ade nine, CMX157, as a potential treatment for human immunodeficiency virus type 1 and hepatitis B virus infections", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20071001), vol. 51, no. 10, doi:10.1128/AAC.00460-07, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 3505 - 3509, XP002485783 [X] 1,3,4,9 * abstract; first § of results; p. 3508, col.2, last § * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.00460-07 | [Y] - CIHLAR T ET AL, "Design and profiling of GS-9148, a novel nucleotide analog active against nucleoside-resistant variants of human immunodeficiency virus type 1, and its orally bioavailable phosphonoamidate prodrug, GS-9131", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY 200802 US LNKD- DOI:10.1128/AAC.01215-07, (200712), vol. 52, no. 2, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 655 - 665, XP002637076 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.01215-07 | [Y] - MYRICK ET AL, "The Triple Combination of Tenofovir, Emtricitabine and Efavirenz Shows Synergistic Anti-HIV-1 Activity In Vitro", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20070327), vol. 74, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.ANTIVIRAL.2007.01.091, ISSN 0166-3542, page A61, XP022002118 [Y] 1-15 * whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.antiviral.2007.01.091 | [Y] - RAY A S ET AL, "Lack of a metabolic and antiviral drug interaction between tenofovir, abacavir and lamivudine", ANTIVIRAL THERAPY, MTM PUBLICATIONS, LONDON, GB, (20050101), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 1359-6535, pages 451 - 457, XP009148298 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - BORROTO-ESODA K ET AL, "In vitro evaluation of the anti-HIV activity and metabolic interactions of tenofovir and emtricitabine", ANTIVIRAL THERAPY, MTM PUBLICATIONS, LONDON, GB, (20060101), vol. 11, no. 3, ISSN 1359-6535, pages 377 - 384, XP009148299 [Y] 1-15 * abstract; tables 2-4 * | [Y] - LYSENG-WILLIAMSON K A ET AL, "Tenofovir disoproxil fumarate: A review of its use in the management of HIV infection", DRUGS, ADIS INTERNATIONAL LTD, NZ, (20050101), vol. 65, no. 3, doi:10.2165/00003495-200565030-00006, ISSN 0012-6667, pages 413 - 432, XP009148294 [Y] 1-15 * table IV; p. 416, col. 2, first full § * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-200565030-00006 | [Y] - DELANEY WILLIAM E 4TH ET AL, "COMBINATIONS OF ADEFOVIR WITH NUCLEOSIDE ANALOGS PRODUCE ADDITIVE ANTIVIRAL EFFECTS AGAINST HEPATITIS B VIRUS IN VITRO", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20041001), vol. 48, no. 10, doi:10.1128/AAC.48.10.3702-3710.2004, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 3702 - 3710, XP009077977 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.48.10.3702-3710.2004 | [Y] - FUNG H B ET AL, "Tenofovir disoproxil fumarate: A nucleotide reverse transcriptase inhibitor for the treatment of HIV infection", CLINICAL THERAPEUTICS, EXCERPTA MEDICA, PRINCETON, NJ, US, (20021001), vol. 24, no. 10, doi:10.1016/S0149-2918(02)80058-3, ISSN 0149-2918, pages 1515 - 1548, XP002285091 [Y] 1-15 * p. 1523, col. 1, first § * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0149-2918(02)80058-3 | [Y] - FRANCHETTI P ET AL, "Inhibition of HIV-1 replication in macrophages by red blood cell-mediated delivery of a heterodinucleotide of lamivudine and tenofovir", NUCLEOSIDES NUCLEOTIDES & NUCLEIC ACIDS, (2007), vol. 26, no. 8-9, ISSN 1525-7770, pages 953 - 957, XP009148476 [Y] 1-15 * abstract; title * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/15257770701508067 | International search | [X]WO2005087788 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [Y]US2005267217 (BARON SAMUEL [US], et al); | [Y]WO2006130217 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) | Examination | WO2009082818 | by applicant | US5519021 | WO9962513 | WO9962520 | WO0039086 | WO0075122 | WO0100578 | US6245806 | US6271402 | WO0230426 | WO0230930 | WO0230931 | WO0236734 | US6395743 | WO02055079 | US2003055071 | US6545007 | US6583149 | US6642245 | US6716825 | WO2004035577 | WO2004035576 | WO2004096807 | WO2005016927 | WO2005079812 | US7034014 | US7094413 | US2006234982 | US2007003516 | US2007072831 | US2007099902 | US7250421 | US2007265227 | WO2008010921 | - PALELLA, N. ENGL. J. MED., (1998), vol. 338, pages 853 - 860 | - RICHMAN, NATURE, (2001), vol. 410, pages 995 - 1001 | - G. PAINTER ET AL., "Evaluation of Hexadecyloxypropyl-9-R-[2-(Phosphonomethoxy)Propyl]-Adenine, CMX157, as a Potential Treatment for Human Immunodeficiency Virus Type 1 and Hepatitis B Virus Infections", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (2007), vol. 51, pages 3505 - 3509 | - PAINTER ET AL., "Evaluation of Hexadecyloxypropyl-9-R-[2-(Phosphonomethoxy)Propyl]-Adenine, CMX157, as a Potential Treatment for Human Immunodeficiency Virus Type 1 and Hepatitis B Virus Infections", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (2007), vol. 51, pages 3505 - 3509 | - JING ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 41, pages 5397 - 5403 | - PAIS, J. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 45, pages 3184 - 94 | - GOLDGUR ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1999), vol. 96, pages 13040 - 13043 | - ESPESETH ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2000), vol. 97, pages 11244 - 11249 | - M. MILLER ET AL., J INFECT DIS., (2004), vol. 189, page 837 | - LOUIE ET AL., "Determining the antiviral activity of tenofovir disoproxil fumarate in treatment-naive chronically HIV-l-infected individuals", AIDS, (2003), vol. 17, page 1151 |