EP2235856 - PHYSICAL LAYER AND DATA LINK LAYER SIGNALLING IN DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCAST PREAMBLE SYMBOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2018/18] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOKELA, Tero Mestarinkatu 3 B 8 FI-FIN-20810 Turku / FI | 02 /
VESMA, Jussi Sahurintie 3 FIN-20320 Turku / FI | 03 /
PEKONEN, Harri Upalingontie 64 FIN-21260 RAISIO / FI | [2010/40] | Representative(s) | Sayer, Robert David, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2018/18] |
Former [2010/40] | Tognetty, Virpi Maria, et al Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department PO Box 407 00045 Nokia Group / FI | Application number, filing date | 09705294.8 | 12.01.2009 | [2010/40] | WO2009FI00009 | Priority number, date | US20080021864 | 29.01.2008 Original published format: US 21864 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009095525 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2235856 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2235856 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 06.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L1/00, // H04H60/07 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04H60/07 (EP,US);
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/40] | H04H20/57, H04H60/90, H04N7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/18] |
Former [2010/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PHYSISCHE SCHICHT UND DATENVERKNÜPFUNGSSCHICHT-SIGNALISIERUNG IN PRÄAMBELSYMBOLEN FÜR DIGITALEN VIDEORUNDFUNK | [2010/40] | English: | PHYSICAL LAYER AND DATA LINK LAYER SIGNALLING IN DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCAST PREAMBLE SYMBOLS | [2010/40] | French: | SIGNALISATION SUR LA COUCHE PHYSIQUE ET LA COUCHE DE LIAISON DE DONNÉES DANS LES SYMBOLES DE PRÉAMBULE EN DIFFUSION VIDÉO NUMÉRIQUE | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 08.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.01.2009 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | DK | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | ES | 02.05.2018 | HR | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | NL | 02.05.2018 | PL | 02.05.2018 | RO | 02.05.2018 | SI | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | NO | 02.08.2018 | GR | 03.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | PT | 03.09.2018 | IE | 12.01.2019 | LU | 12.01.2019 | MT | 12.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | FR | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.01.2009 | |
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
IE | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
MT | 12.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CY | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
IE | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
MT | 12.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
IE | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
MT | 12.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
IE | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
MT | 12.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
IE | 12.01.2019 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
LU | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - DVB BROADCASTING, "Frame structure channel coding and modulation for a second generation digital terrestrial broadcasting system (DVB-T2)", no. DVB Document A122r1, (20080101), pages 1 - 165, DVB DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING,, URL: http://www.dvb.org/technology/standards/a122r1.tm3980r7.DVB-T2.pdf, (20120117), XP002667650 [X] 1,3,5,7,9-16 * pages 53-54, 75, 79-80, 87-88 * [I] 2,4,6,8 | [Y] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "46NokiaPanasonic_L1_M&I046.pdf", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20071116), XP017817977 [Y] 1,5,9,11,15 * sections I-VII * | [Y] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "M&I-Rep2Kingswood.pdf", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20071120), XP017817198 [Y] 1,5,9,11,15 * page 40 * | [Y] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "71Report10M&I71.pdf", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20080111), XP017817946 [Y] 1,5,9,11,15 * agenda item 3 * | International search | [A]WO2004015948 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]WO2007039479 (UDCAST [FR], et al); | [A]US2007220406 (GUBBI RAJUGOPAL [IN], et al); | [A] - "DVB-H Implementation Guidelines: Section 6 Physical layer elements, Section 7 DVB-H/DVB-T compatibility issues, Section 8 DVB-H services (8.1 Service scenarios)", ETSI TR 102 377 V1.2.1 (2005-11) DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING (DVB), pages 34 - 42, XP008137540 | [A] - FARIA, G. ET AL., "DVB-H: Digital broadcast services to handheld devices", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (200601), vol. 94, no. 1, pages 194 - 209, XP008137542 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2005.861011 |