EP2247542 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COOLING SEMICONDUCTOR COATED HOT GLASS SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2013 | Request for preliminary examination | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Willard & Kelsey Solar Group, Llc 1745 Progress Drive Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIDER, James, E. 811 West Wooster Street Bowling Green OH 43402 / US | 02 /
FAYKOSH, Gary, T. 436 South Ridge Drive Perrysburg OH 43551 / US | [2010/45] | Representative(s) | GPI & Associés EuroParc de Pichaury Bâtiment B2 - 1er Etage 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | GPI & Associés 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichaury, Bât B2 13856 Aix en Provence Cedex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09705621.2 | 05.01.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009US30072 | Priority number, date | US20080020772 | 28.01.2008 Original published format: US 20772 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009097164 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2247542 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C03B25/08, H01L21/677, H01L21/67, C03B29/10, C03B35/20, C03B29/08, C03B25/087 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
C03B29/10 (EP,US);
C03B25/08 (EP,US);
C03B25/087 (EP,US);
C03B29/08 (EP,US);
C03B35/20 (EP,US);
H01L21/67109 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/45] | C03B13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KÜHLUNG HALBLEITERBESCHICHTETER HEISSGLASSCHEIBEN | [2010/45] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COOLING SEMICONDUCTOR COATED HOT GLASS SHEETS | [2010/45] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR REFROIDIR DES PLAQUES DE VERRE CHAUDES RECOUVERTES DE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/04] | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 28.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005213950 (YOSHIMURA MASANAO [JP]) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0038] , [0040]; figure 2 * [Y] 2-10,12-18; | [YA]US1981560 (LITTLETON JESSE T) [Y] 2,5,7,12 * page 2, line 4 - line 7 * * page 2, line 21 - line 23 * [A] 1,11; | [YA]US2007122936 (PARK WANG J [KR], et al) [Y] 3,4,6,8-10,13-18 * paragraphs [0115] , [0116] , [0140]; figures 11,14a * [A] 1,11; | [A]US3655233 (TWIST DOUGLAS) [A] 1,11 * column 2, line 74 - column 3, line 3 * | International search | [X]US5248349 (FOOTE JAMES B [US], et al); | [Y]US2007158654 (KHOLODENKO ARNOLD V [US], et al); | [Y]US4159842 (PERKOWSKI ALFRED D) |