EP2248808 - PROPHYLACTIC OR THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR ATTENTION DEFICIT/HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka- shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAI, Keisuke c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85, Jusohonmachi 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 532-8686 / JP | [2014/29] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
HIRAI, Keisuke c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85 Jusohonmachi 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 532-8686 / JP | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [2014/29] |
Former [2010/45] | Dossmann, Gérard, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09705629.5 | 30.01.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009JP51658 | Priority number, date | JP20080022059 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008022059 | [2010/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009096564 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2248808 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2248808 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/77, A61K31/343, A61K45/00, A61K45/06, A61P25/14, A61P25/28 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
A61K31/343 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D307/77 (EP,US);
C07D317/60 (EP,US);
C07D319/18 (EP,US);
C07D491/048 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/343, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/44] | C07D307/77, A61K31/343, A61K45/00, A61K45/06, A61P25/14 | ||
Former IPC [2010/45] | C07D307/77, A61K31/343, A61K45/00, A61P25/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | PROPHYLAKTISCHER ODER THERAPEUTISCHER WIRKSTOFF GEGEN AUFMERKSAMKEITSDEFIZITE UND HYPERAKTIVITÄT | [2010/45] | English: | PROPHYLACTIC OR THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR ATTENTION DEFICIT/HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER | [2010/45] | French: | AGENT PROPHYLACTIQUE OU THÉRAPEUTIQUE POUR LE TROUBLE DU DÉFICIT DE L'ATTENTION AVEC HYPERACTIVITÉ | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2010 | Translation filed | 30.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 26.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2009 | AT | 16.07.2014 | BE | 16.07.2014 | CY | 16.07.2014 | CZ | 16.07.2014 | DK | 16.07.2014 | EE | 16.07.2014 | FI | 16.07.2014 | HR | 16.07.2014 | LT | 16.07.2014 | LV | 16.07.2014 | MC | 16.07.2014 | MK | 16.07.2014 | MT | 16.07.2014 | NL | 16.07.2014 | PL | 16.07.2014 | RO | 16.07.2014 | SE | 16.07.2014 | SI | 16.07.2014 | SK | 16.07.2014 | TR | 16.07.2014 | BG | 16.10.2014 | NO | 16.10.2014 | GR | 17.10.2014 | IS | 16.11.2014 | PT | 17.11.2014 | IE | 30.01.2015 | LU | 30.01.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 30.01.2009 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.01.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 16.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02076452 (POOGER PROPERTIES LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, lines 5-6 * * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 14 * * page 7, lines 1-5 * * claims 1, 5, 6 *; | [Y]WO2004028532 (POOGER PROPERTIES LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, lines 4-7 * * page 2, lines 24-33 * * page 5, lines 19-22 * * claims 1, 6 *; | [Y]WO2007052166 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 4, paragraph 4 * * page 5, paragraph 7 * * example 2 * * claims 29, 33, 34 *; | [Y]WO9732871 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, lines 5-7 * * page 7, line 5 - page 8, line 14 * * page 15, lines 34-36; compound (25) * * page 252, lines 39-45 * * claims 1, 24, 34, 35, 40 * | [Y] - OWEN RICHARD T, "Ramelteon: Profile of a new sleep-promoting medication", DRUGS OF TODAY, (200604), vol. 42, no. 4, ISSN 1699-3993, pages 255 - 263, XP002659665 [Y] 1-6 * page 256, column 2, paragraph l * * table 1 * * page 261, column 1, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1358/DOT.2006.42.4.970842 | International search | [X]JP2007513095 (B & B BEHEER B.V.); | [X]WO2007025177 (BRAINCELLS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2007030697 (BRAINCELLS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2006107019 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2004527551 (LUNDBECK AS H); | [Y]WO2006038084 (NEUROCURE LTD [IE], et al); | [Y]WO2006037996 (MERZ PHARMA GMBH & CO KGAA [DE], et al); | [XP]US2008167363 (BARLOW CARROLEE [US], et al); | [XP]WO2008035177 (COPHARM [LU], et al) | Examination | - D. J. CADA, "Formulary Drug Reviews - Ramelteon", HOSPITAL PHARMACY, (2006), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 59 - 69 | - MIYAMOTO MASAOMI ET AL, "Behavioral pharmacology of ramelteon (TAK-375) in small mammals.", ANNALS OF NEUROLOGY, & 128TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN NEUROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION ON NEUROLOGY OUTCOMES RESEARCH: CURREN; SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA; OCTOBER 19-22, 2003, (2003), vol. 54, no. Suppl. 7, ISSN 0364-5134, page S46, XP009126297 | - VAN DER HEIJDEN KRISTIAAN B ET AL, "Effect of melatonin on sleep, behavior, and cognition in ADHD and chronic sleep-onset insomnia", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF CHILD & ADOLESCENT PSYCHIATRY, (200702), vol. 46, no. 2, ISSN 0890-8567, pages 233 - 241 | - "Diagnostic criteria for Attention-deficit/Hyperactivity disorder", ADHDFamilyOnline, (20000101), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.adhdfamilyonline.com/public/images/DSM_Checklist.pdf, (20130722), XP055072207 | by applicant | US6034239 | JPH10287665 | - SAGVOLDEN T; RUSSELL VA; AASE H; JOHANSEN EB; FARSHBAF M., "Rodent models of attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder", BIOL PSYCHIATRY., (2005), vol. 57, no. 11, pages 1239 - 47 | - UENO KI; TOGASHI H; MORI K; MATSUMOTO M; OHASHI S; HOSHINO A; FUJITA T; SAITO H; MINAMI M; YOSHIOKA M., "Behavioural and pharmacological relevance of stroke-prone spontaneously hypertensive rats as an animal model of a developmental disorder", BEHAV PHARMACOL., (2002), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 1 - 13 |