EP2240465 - NOVEL PHENOL COMPOUNDS AND (CO)POLYMERS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sikkema, Doetze Jakob Heimanslaan 6 6705 AG Wageningen / NL | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERSTEEGEN, Ronny Mathieu Langstraat 16 NL-5963 NW Hegelsom / NL | 02 /
POUDEROIJEN, Maarten Jozef Sint Annastraat 63 NL-6524 EH Nijmegen / NL | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2010/42] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J. W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09706028.9 | 30.01.2009 | [2010/42] | WO2009NL50042 | Priority number, date | US20080024612 | 30.01.2008 Original published format: US 24612 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009096786 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2240465 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2240465 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/44, C07D401/10 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
C07D401/10 (EP,US);
C08G65/44 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/42] | C07D401/10, C08G73/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2010/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NEUE PHENOLVERBINDUNGEN UND (CO)POLYMERE DAVON | [2010/42] | English: | NOVEL PHENOL COMPOUNDS AND (CO)POLYMERS THEREOF | [2010/42] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSÉS DU PHÉNOL ET (CO)POLYMÈRES DE CEUX-CI | [2010/42] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2009 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BE | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | ES | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | HR | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | MK | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | NO | 14.01.2016 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IE | 30.01.2016 | LU | 30.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | PT | 15.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.01.2009 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.01.2009 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.01.2009 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004116425 (LI FRANCINE FEIRONG [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 13, compound 5 *; | [X]WO2005095469 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * example 4 *; | [DA]EP1760110 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [DA] 1-23 * page 2, line 3 - page 2, line 6; example -; claim - *; | [DA]WO02081547 (CELANESE VENTURES GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-23 * page 1, 1st paragraph;;; example -; claim - * | [PX] - J. YU ET AL, "Conformational Driven Asymmetric Induction of a Catalytic Dendrimer", AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2008), vol. 130, no. 25, pages 7845 - 7847, XP002527223 [PX] 1,2,4,5 * figure 1, compound C2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JA802308A | [PX] - CH. J. DAVIES, "Use of a Suzuki crosss-coupling as a route to 2-phenoxy-6-iminopyridines and chiral 2-phenoxy-6-(methanamino)pyridines", TETRAHEDRON, (2008), vol. 64, no. 42, pages 9857 - 9864, XP024528645 [PX] 1,2,4,5 * page 9857, figure 1, compound "a"; page 9858, table 2, entry 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2008.08.019 | [X] - H. BAYER ET AL, "Über die Michael-Addition von Picolyl-(2)-Ketonen", CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, (1957), vol. 90, pages 592 - 598, XP002527224 [X] 1,2,4 * page 90, compound Vb * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cber.19570900422 | [X] - L. CHARDONNENS, "Sur les dérivés de la fluorénone. IX La (pyridyl-2)-3-fluorénone, la methyl-2-(pyridyl-2)-3-fluorénone et la methyl-3-(pyridiyl-2-3-fluorénone", HELVETIA CHIMICA ACTA, (1979), vol. 3, no. 62, pages 657 - 666, XP002527225 [X] 1,2 * page 658, compound 8 * | [X] - K. EICHINGER ET AL, "Neue Synthesen alkylaryl- und diaryl-disubstituierter Phenole und Salicylsäure-ethylester", SYNTHESIS, (1987), vol. 12, pages 1061 - 1064, XP002527226 [X] 1,2 * page 1061, compound 6a * | [X] - P. WANG ET AL, "Synthesis, X-ray structure, and self-assembly of functionalized bis(2,2':6',2'-terpyridinyl)arenes", ORGANIC LETTERS, (2004), vol. 6, no. 8, pages 1197 - 1200, XP002527227 [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/OL0364529 | [X] - Y. D. M. CHAMPOURET ET AL, "Sterically variable dizine complexes bearing bis(iminopyridyl)phenolate ligands: synthesis, structures and reactivity studies", DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (2007), vol. 40, pages 4565 - 4575, XP002527228 [X] 1,2 * page 4566, scheme 1, starting compound and compounds 1a-d * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B709385C | [X] - P. WANG ET AL, "Synthesis of a water-soluble hexameric metallomacrocycle and its oxidized single-wall carbon nanotube composite", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 17, no. 29, pages 3023 - 3029, XP002527229 [X] 1,2 * page 3024, "general procedure for synthesis of 1", 2nd line * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B702797D |