Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011006107 | ![]() | 13.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022204921 | ![]() | 30.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US202016746236 | 17.01.2020 | US36348809 | 30.01.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | US202217694588 | 14.03.2022 | US201615365646 | 30.11.2016 | US201314011672 | 27.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9512403 | ![]() | 06.12.2016 | B2 | US2013344161 | 26.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US200913363488 | 30.01.2009 | US36348809 | 30.01.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | US201314011672 | 27.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8535913 | ![]() | 17.09.2013 | B2 | US2010210530 | 19.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US36348809 | 30.01.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8524494 | ![]() | 03.09.2013 | B2 | US2010196963 | 05.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US36348809 | 30.01.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010166824 | ![]() | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US36348809 | 30.01.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8530415 | ![]() | 10.09.2013 | B2 | US2010158975 | 24.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US36348809 | 30.01.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8257947 | ![]() | 04.09.2012 | B2 | US2010047305 | 25.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US36348809 | 30.01.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11274276 | ![]() | 15.03.2022 | B2 | US2020149002 | 14.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US202016746236 | 17.01.2020 | US36348809 | 30.01.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | US201615365646 | 30.11.2016 | US201314011672 | 27.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10538736 | ![]() | 21.01.2020 | B2 | US2017145380 | 25.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US36348809 | 30.01.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | US201615365646 | 30.11.2016 | US201314011672 | 27.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101834019B | ![]() | 02.03.2018 | B1 | KR20120089235 | 09.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41583 | 09.07.2010 | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5647007B | ![]() | 24.12.2014 | B2 | JP2011510662 | 07.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | WO2009US32697 | 30.01.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2451964 | ![]() | 24.01.2018 | B1 | EP2451964 | 17.04.2013 | A4 | EP2451964 | 16.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41583 | 09.07.2010 | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102482698B | ![]() | 25.09.2018 | B | CN102482698 | 30.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41583 | 09.07.2010 | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2767600 | ![]() | 31.05.2022 | C | CA2767600 | 13.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41583 | 09.07.2010 | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2714387 | ![]() | 19.06.2018 | C | CA2714387 | 06.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | WO2009US32697 | 30.01.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010271212B | ![]() | 16.07.2015 | B2 | AU2010271212 | 01.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41583 | 09.07.2010 | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009209022B | ![]() | 12.06.2014 | B2 | AU2009209022 | 06.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | WO2009US32697 | 30.01.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2262891 | ![]() | 21.09.2022 | B1 | EP2262891 | 20.04.2011 | A4 | EP2262891 | 22.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | WO2009US32697 | 30.01.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AP3129 | 28.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | WO2009US32697 | 30.01.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012000517 | 12.04.2022 | B1 | BR112012000517 | 05.01.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41583 | 09.07.2010 | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122020017131 | 16.05.2023 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | WO2009US32697 | 30.01.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0906972 | 08.09.2021 | B1 | BRPI0906972 | 14.07.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | WO2009US32697 | 30.01.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3152419 | 13.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | CA2767600 | 09.07.2010 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102066558B | 08.02.2017 | B | CN102066558 | 18.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | WO2009US32697 | 30.01.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2451964T | 30.04.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41583 | 09.07.2010 | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2667265T | 10.05.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41583 | 09.07.2010 | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20180594T | 10.08.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41583 | 09.07.2010 | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | EP10797941 | 09.07.2010 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE038882T | 28.12.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012000455 | 11.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41583 | 09.07.2010 | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO2451964T | 23.06.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41583 | 09.07.2010 | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2451964T | 31.08.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41583 | 09.07.2010 | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | EP10797941 | 09.07.2010 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2451964T | 07.05.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2631488 | 22.09.2017 | C2 | RU2012104650 | 20.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010US41583 | 09.07.2010 | US50917109 | 24.07.2009 | US50131209 | 10.07.2009 | US54742209 | 25.08.2009 | US63272109 | 07.12.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201006148 | 26.10.2011 | B | Priority number | Date | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | WO2009US32697 | 30.01.2009 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009097559 | ![]() | 06.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101650957B | ![]() | 24.08.2016 | B1 | KR20110011599 | 08.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014221070 | ![]() | 27.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201500237T | 29.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201906494P | 27.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US2485408 | 30.01.2008 | US5094008 | 06.05.2008 | US3436108 | 06.03.2008 |