EP2240135 - APPARATUS FOR TREATING OBESITY AND REFLUX DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Implantica Patent Ltd. Ideon Science Park 223 70 Lund / SE | [2019/25] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Kirk Promotion LTD. Frejgatan 13, Att. 1492 114 79 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Milux Holding SA 6 rue Guillaume Schneider 2522 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states Milux Holding SA 12 Rue Guillaume Schneider 2522 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSELL, Peter Aegeristrasse 66 CH-6300 Zug / CH | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/09] |
Former [2010/42] | Aurell, Henrik Albihns.Zacco Studentgatan 4 Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 09706258.2 | 29.01.2009 | [2010/42] | WO2009SE00051 | Priority number, date | US20080006719P | 29.01.2008 Original published format: US 6719 P | SE20080002138 | 10.10.2008 Original published format: SE 0802138 | [2010/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009096866 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2240135 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2240135 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00, // A61B1/04, A61B1/273, A61B1/313, A61B17/00, A61B17/04, A61B17/064, A61B17/068, A61B17/08, A61B17/30, A61B17/32, A61B17/34, A61F2/04, A61N1/36 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
A61F5/003 (EP,SE,US);
A61F2/04 (EP,SE,US);
A61F5/0036 (EP,CN,SE,US);
A61B1/04 (EP,US);
A61B1/06 (EP,US);
A61B1/2736 (EP,US);
A61B1/3132 (EP,US);
A61B1/32 (EP);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/0469 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61F5/0003 (EP,US);
A61F5/0013 (EP,US);
A61F5/0026 (EP,US);
A61F5/0033 (EP,US);
A61F5/004 (EP,US);
A61F5/0043 (EP,US);
A61F5/0046 (EP,US);
A61F5/005 (EP,US);
A61F5/0063 (EP,CN,US);
A61F5/0069 (EP,SE,US);
A61F5/0073 (EP,US);
A61F5/0079 (EP,US);
A61F5/0083 (EP,US);
A61F5/0086 (EP,US);
A61F5/0089 (EP,US);
A61N1/36007 (EP,US);
A61B17/00 (US);
A61B17/064 (US);
A61B17/0682 (EP,US);
A61B17/08 (US);
A61B17/30 (US);
A61B17/320016 (US);
A61B17/3423 (US);
A61B17/3474 (US);
A61B17/3478 (EP);
A61B2017/00278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00561 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00818 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00827 (EP,US);
A61B2017/081 (US);
A61B2017/306 (EP,US);
A61B2017/308 (EP,US);
A61F2002/044 (EP,US);
A61F2002/045 (US);
A61F2005/0016 (EP,US);
A61F2005/002 (EP,US);
A61F2005/0023 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/10] | A61F5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/42] | A61F5/00, A61F2/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2010/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ADIPOSITAS UND GASTROÖSOPHAGEALEM REFLUX | [2010/42] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TREATING OBESITY AND REFLUX DISEASE | [2010/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DU REFLUX GASTRO-OESOPHAGIEN | [2010/42] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 03.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.12.2018 | 11.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.05.2020 | 22.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.05.2020 | 06.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.03.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.04.2021 | 24.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21185629.9 / EP3967281 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2013 | 31.01.2020 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MK | 04.08.2021 | [2024/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0000108 (KIRK PROMOTIONS LIMITED [GB], et al); | [A]US6432040 (MEAH NIZAM N [US]); | [Y]WO2004112563 (IMPULSE DYNAMICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP1600128 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]); | [A]US2006247721 (MASCHINO STEVEN E [US], et al); | [A]EP1736123 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]); | [XY]EP1743604 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) | International search | [A]US5297536 (WILK PETER J [US]); | [A]WO0158391 (OBTECH MEDICAL AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO0167964 (MEDIGUS LTD [IL], et al); | [A]US2003055442 (LAUFER MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [A]US2003163029 (SONNENSCHEIN ELAZAR [IL], et al); | [A]US2005245957 (STARKEBAUM WARREN L [US], et al); | [A]WO2005105003 (SYNECOR LLC [US], et al); | [A]US2005261712 (BALBIERZ DANIEL J [US], et al) |